This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 04/05/2020 at 07:20:52 (UTC).

JASON R BAILEY MD P A vs. BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF TEXAS INC

Case Summary

On 03/12/2020 JASON R BAILEY MD P A filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF TEXAS INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LARRY WEIMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6707

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LARRY WEIMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LONE STAR SURGICAL PARTNERS P A

Defendants and Others

TEXAS CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL

HEALTH SELECT INC

FMC TECHNOLOGIES INC

ABC CORPS 1-100

BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF TEXAS INC

XYLEM INC

ENTERPRISE PRODUCTS OPERATING LLC

H E B LP

KEY ENERGY SERVICES INC

NATIONAL OILWELL VARCO L P

MCCURDY SERVICES INC

WINTHER INVESTMENT INC

DOWNHOLE TECHNOLOGY

J E B TRUCKING LLC

TIDELAND SIGNAL CORP (ALSO DOING BUSINESS AS XYLEM INC)

WELLBOSS CO LLC (DOING BUSINESS AS DOWNHOLE TECHNOLOGY)

ENTERPRISE PRODUCTS PARTNERS L P (ALSO KNOWN AS ENTERPRISE PRODUCTS

TEXAS CHILDREN'S HEALTH PLAN

UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM

23 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERTS, SEAN ALAN

 

Court Documents

Exhibit B

03/12/2020: Exhibit B

Exhibit A

03/12/2020: Exhibit A

Plaintiffs' Original Petition

03/12/2020: Plaintiffs' Original Petition

Certified mail tracking number 7019 0140 0000 5909 7628

03/17/2020: Certified mail tracking number 7019 0140 0000 5909 7628

Certified mail tracking number 7019 0140 0000 5909 7703

03/17/2020: Certified mail tracking number 7019 0140 0000 5909 7703

Certified mail tracking number 7019 0140 0000 5909 7697

03/17/2020: Certified mail tracking number 7019 0140 0000 5909 7697

Certified mail tracking number 7019 0140 0000 5909 7680

03/17/2020: Certified mail tracking number 7019 0140 0000 5909 7680

Certified mail tracking number 7019 0140 0000 5909 7666

03/17/2020: Certified mail tracking number 7019 0140 0000 5909 7666

Certified mail tracking number 7019 0140 0000 5909 7611

03/17/2020: Certified mail tracking number 7019 0140 0000 5909 7611

Request for Issuance of Service

03/18/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

03/18/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

03/18/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance to Service

03/18/2020: Request for Issuance to Service

Certified mail tracking number 7019 0140 0000 5909 7659

03/19/2020: Certified mail tracking number 7019 0140 0000 5909 7659

Signed Affidavit of David Estes

03/25/2020: Signed Affidavit of David Estes

Exhibit D

03/25/2020: Exhibit D

Exhibit C

03/25/2020: Exhibit C

Exhibit A

03/25/2020: Exhibit A

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ROBERTS, SEAN ALAN; Person Filing: LONE STAR SURGICAL PARTNERS P A;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ROBERTS, SEAN ALAN; Person Filing: JASON R BAILEY MD P A;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENTERPRISE PRODUCTS OPERATING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where FMC TECHNOLOGIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Winther Investment, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where DOWNHOLE TECHNOLOGY is a litigant