This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/10/2022 at 07:16:33 (UTC).

JAML INVEST LLC vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 09/16/2022 JAML INVEST LLC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL GOMEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9148

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL GOMEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAML INVEST LLC

Defendant

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Other

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS

Houston, TX 77040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLE, KENNETH RYAN

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Original Petition

09/16/2022: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Citation

09/30/2022: Citation

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS; Issued: 9/16/2022; Served: 9/28/2022; Returned: 9/29/2022; Tracking: 74052681; Deliver To: CONST 1 ALAN ROSEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: COLE, KENNETH RYAN; Person Filing: JAML INVEST LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLE , KENNETH RYAN