This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/31/2020 at 07:17:55 (UTC).

JAMES, DENISE vs. STATE OF TEXAS ATTORNEY GENERAL

Case Summary

On 07/07/2020 JAMES, DENISE filed an Other lawsuit against STATE OF TEXAS ATTORNEY GENERAL. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is R. K. SANDILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9935

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

R. K. SANDILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAMES, DENISE

Defendant

STATE OF TEXAS ATTORNEY GENERAL

Other

STATE OF TEXAS ATTORNEY GENERAL BY SERVING

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7019 2280 0000 0786 9988

07/07/2020: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7019 2280 0000 0786 9988

Certified Mail Receipt

07/09/2020: Certified Mail Receipt

Domestic Return Receipt

07/17/2020: Domestic Return Receipt

Plaintiffs Original Petition

07/06/2020: Plaintiffs Original Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: JAMES, DENISE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: STATE OF TEXAS ATTORNEY GENERAL BY SERVING; Issued: 7/7/2020; Tracking: 73764169; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less