This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/10/2021 at 07:36:22 (UTC).

JACKSON, OTHA REE vs. HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

Case Summary

On 06/16/2021 JACKSON, OTHA REE filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is URSULA A. HALL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6197

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

URSULA A. HALL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JACKSON, OTHA REE

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

HARRIS COUNTY COMMUNITY SUPERVISION & CORRECTIONS DEPARTMENT

OCA EXPUNCTIONS - LEGAL DIVISION

Others

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

1200 Baker Street

Houston, TX 77011

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L. ROSE

1310 Prairie 5Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR

102 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

COMMUNITY SUPERVISION & CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY PHD

49 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

OCA EXPUNCTIONS -LEGAL DIVISION BY SERVING MARGIE JOHNSON

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVANS, COLLIN ARTHUR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2021
  • HearingCourt: 165; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: OCA EXPUNCTIONS -LEGAL DIVISION BY SERVING MARGIE JOHNSON; Issued: 7/1/2021; Tracking: 73886254; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: COMMUNITY SUPERVISION & CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY PHD; Issued: 7/1/2021; Tracking: 73884178; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR; Issued: 7/1/2021; Tracking: 73884176; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR; Issued: 7/1/2021; Tracking: 73884174; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 7/1/2021; Tracking: 73884173; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L. ROSE; Issued: 7/1/2021; Tracking: 73884169; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 7/1/2021; Tracking: 73884165; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 7/1/2021; Tracking: 73884112; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 6/26/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EVANS, COLLIN ARTHUR; Person Filing: JACKSON, OTHA REE;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OCA EXPUNCTIONS- LEGAL DIVISIONS is a litigant

Latest cases where COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY PHD is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES is a litigant