This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 03/23/2019 at 07:44:35 (UTC).

JABER, GABRIELA vs. COMPASS BANK (D/B/A BBVA COMPASS)

Case Summary

On 02/27/2019 JABER, GABRIELA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against COMPASS BANK D/B/A BBVA COMPASS. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is TANYA GARRISON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4856

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

TANYA GARRISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JABER, GABRIELA

Houston, TX 77070

CAMPERO, MIGUEL

Houston, TX 77070

Defendants

BBVA COMPASS

COMPASS BANK (D/B/A BBVA COMPASS)

Other

COMPASS BANK (D/B/A BBVA COMPASS)(FOREIGN CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201-3163

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JARRETT, LATOYA P

3033 Chimney Ro

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant Attorney

HUTTENBACH, WILLIAM PATTERSON

1415 Louisiana

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Motion to Extend TRO and Continue Temporary Injunction Hearing

03/05/2019: Plaintiff's Motion to Extend TRO and Continue Temporary Injunction Hearing

Exhibit M

03/06/2019: Exhibit M

Exhibit K

03/06/2019: Exhibit K

Exhibit I

03/06/2019: Exhibit I

Exhibit G

03/06/2019: Exhibit G

Exhibit F

03/06/2019: Exhibit F

Exhibit C

03/06/2019: Exhibit C

Exhibit B

03/06/2019: Exhibit B

Exhibit A

03/06/2019: Exhibit A

Exhibit

03/06/2019: Exhibit

Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

03/06/2019: Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

Proposed Temporary Restraining Order

02/27/2019: Proposed Temporary Restraining Order

Exhibit D

02/27/2019: Exhibit D

Exhibit C

02/27/2019: Exhibit C

Exhibit B

02/27/2019: Exhibit B

Exhibit A

02/27/2019: Exhibit A

Plaintiffs Original petition Application for Injunctive Relief and Application for Temporary Restraining Order

02/27/2019: Plaintiffs Original petition Application for Injunctive Relief and Application for Temporary Restraining Order

ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING

02/28/2019: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2019
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HUTTENBACH, WILLIAM PATTERSON; Person Filing: COMPASS BANK (D/B/A BBVA COMPASS);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Description: REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Description: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED; Order Signed: 2/28/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 2/28/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Description: APPEARANCE ON TEMPORARY INJ OR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Order Signed: 2/28/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Description: MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER GRANTED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: JARRETT, LATOYA P; Person Filing: CAMPERO, MIGUEL;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: JARRETT, LATOYA P; Person Filing: JABER, GABRIELA;

    Read MoreRead Less