This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/19/2020 at 07:19:17 (UTC).

J G WENTWORTH ORIGINATIONS LLC vs. IN RE (STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT)

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 J G WENTWORTH ORIGINATIONS LLC filed an Other lawsuit against IN RE STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1406

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

J G WENTWORTH ORIGINATIONS LLC

Other

IN RE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROGERS, BARBARA M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing on Application for Approval of Sale of Partial Payment Rights

06/01/2020: Notice of Hearing on Application for Approval of Sale of Partial Payment Rights

Proposed Order Approving Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Right

06/17/2020: Proposed Order Approving Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Right

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2020
  • HearingCourt: 011; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: MTN PERMITTING PAYMENT BY INSTALLMENTS; Requesting Party: ROGERS, BARBARA M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ROGERS, BARBARA M.; Person Filing: J G WENTWORTH ORIGINATIONS LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less