Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/12/2020 at 11:39:42 (UTC).

ISSA, ZIAD vs. RING, MARINA

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 ISSA, ZIAD filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RING, MARINA. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is TANYA GARRISON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9478

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

TANYA GARRISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ISSA, ZIAD

Defendants

HERNANDEZ, ISAMISH

Houston, TX 77063

RING, MARINA

Bellaire, TX 77401

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASAFI, JAMAL A.

Defendant Attorneys

FUENTES, ALEJANDRO JR.

JOSEPH, SONDET FRANCOISE

 

Court Documents

Defendant Isamish Hernandez's Original Answer, Demand for Jury Trial and Request for Disclosure

04/20/2020: Defendant Isamish Hernandez's Original Answer, Demand for Jury Trial and Request for Disclosure

Certificate of Written Discovery

04/23/2020: Certificate of Written Discovery

Defendant Orginal Answer

04/23/2020: Defendant Orginal Answer

Certificate of Written Discovery

05/27/2020: Certificate of Written Discovery

Citation Return

04/07/2020: Citation Return

Citation Return

04/07/2020: Citation Return

Original Petition

03/26/2020: Original Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: JOSEPH, SONDET FRANCOISE; Person Filing: RING, MARINA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FUENTES, ALEJANDRO JR.; Person Filing: HERNANDEZ, ISAMISH;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: RING, MARINA; Issued: 3/27/2020; Served: 4/2/2020; Tracking: 73738607; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HERNANDEZ, ISAMISH; Issued: 3/27/2020; Served: 4/2/2020; Tracking: 73738606; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ASAFI, JAMAL A.; Person Filing: ISSA, ZIAD;

    Read MoreRead Less