This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/22/2018 at 03:42:12 (UTC).

INTRA SERVICES INC vs. CLEAN CO SYSTEMS

Case Summary

On 01/13/2016 INTRA SERVICES INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CLEAN CO SYSTEMS. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL D. MILLER and KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2295

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

MICHAEL D. MILLER

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

INTRA SERVICES INC

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

CLEAN CO SYSTEMS

Other

CLEAN CO SYSTEMS (A TEXAS CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS

16308 Avenue C

Channelview, TX 77530

Not Classified By Court

FRY, TERRY G.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

PEEL, ANDREA CHRISTINE

PATTERSON, KIP EDWARD

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

BUCK, WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

Exhibit A

01/13/2016: Exhibit A

Civil Process Request Form

01/13/2016: Civil Process Request Form

Plaintiff's Verified Original Petition & Request for Disclosure

01/13/2016: Plaintiff's Verified Original Petition & Request for Disclosure

Notice of Oral Hearing

02/16/2016: Notice of Oral Hearing

Motion for Sustituted Service

02/16/2016: Motion for Sustituted Service

Proposed Order

02/22/2016: Proposed Order

ORDER DENYING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SIGNED

03/02/2016: ORDER DENYING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SIGNED

Exhibit A

03/04/2016: Exhibit A

ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SIGNED

03/11/2016: ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SIGNED

Plaintiff's Certificate of Written Discovery

07/08/2016: Plaintiff's Certificate of Written Discovery

Intra Services, Inc.'s Original Answer to Counterclaim

07/08/2016: Intra Services, Inc.'s Original Answer to Counterclaim

Plaintiff's Certificate of Written Discovery

08/17/2016: Plaintiff's Certificate of Written Discovery

Plaintiff's Certificate of Written Discovery

10/19/2016: Plaintiff's Certificate of Written Discovery

Proposed Agreed Order for Mediator

01/30/2017: Proposed Agreed Order for Mediator

ORDER SIGNED GRANTING REFERRAL TO MEDIATION

01/31/2017: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING REFERRAL TO MEDIATION

Defendants first amended sworn answer and counterclaim

03/06/2017: Defendants first amended sworn answer and counterclaim

Filing Letter

03/24/2017: Filing Letter

Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice

04/05/2017: Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2017
  • Description: EACH PAY OWN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Description: DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES; Order Signed: 4/6/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Description: HOLD FOR JUDGMENT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Description: AMENDED COUNTER CLAIM; Filing Attorney: BUCK, WILLIAM; Person Filing: CLEAN CO SYSTEMS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BUCK, WILLIAM; Person Filing: CLEAN CO SYSTEMS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; Order Signed: 1/31/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • Description: ANSWER COUNTER CLAIM; Filing Attorney: PATTERSON, KIP EDWARD; Person Filing: INTRA SERVICES INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • Description: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 6/29/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • Description: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • Description: COUNTER CLAIM; Filing Attorney: BUCK, WILLIAM; Person Filing: CLEAN CO SYSTEMS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BUCK, WILLIAM; Person Filing: CLEAN CO SYSTEMS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • Description: ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SIGNED; Order Signed: 3/11/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • Description: ORDER DENYING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SIGNED; Order Signed: 3/2/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PEEL, ANDREA CHRISTINE; Person Filing: INTRA SERVICES INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • Description: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less