This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/25/2021 at 07:33:11 (UTC).

IGUNBOR, OTASOWIE EHIOSU vs. HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE ATTN: EXPUNC

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 IGUNBOR, OTASOWIE EHIOSU filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE ATTN EXPUNC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DONNA ROTH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9662

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DONNA ROTH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IGUNBOR, OTASOWIE EHIOSU

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE ATTN: EXPUNC

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE ATTN: EXPUNCTIONS

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT ATTN: EXPUNCTIONS

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY CRIME RECORDS MSC 0234

HARRIS COUNTY OFFICE OF COURT SERVICES

FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS-IDENTIFICATION

Others

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L. ROSE

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

HARRIS COUNTY OFFICE OF COURT SERVICES BY SERVING

FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEDLEY, JIM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • HearingCourt: 295; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 7/16/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MEDLEY, JIM; Person Filing: IGUNBOR, OTASOWIE EHIOSU;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY OFFICE OF COURT SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE is a litigant