This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 02/25/2021 at 07:58:37 (UTC).

HUNT, TRAVIS vs. TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLC

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 HUNT, TRAVIS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOT DOLLINGER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6172

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

SCOT DOLLINGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HUNT, TRAVIS

Defendant

TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLC

Other

TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLC MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS REGISTERED AGENT

Houston, TX 77042

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KARAM, JACOB

 

Court Documents

Request for Issuance of Service

02/01/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

02/01/2021: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

Return of Service

02/04/2021: Return of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLC MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS REGISTERED AGENT; Issued: 2/2/2021; Served: 2/4/2021; Tracking: 73836994; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: KARAM, JACOB; Person Filing: HUNT, TRAVIS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KARAM, JACOB