This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/17/2015 at 09:41:28 (UTC).

HUMPHRIES, JERLINE vs. A W CHESTERTON

Case Summary

On 07/15/2005 HUMPHRIES, JERLINE filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against A W CHESTERTON. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******731D

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2005

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HUMPHRIES, JERLINE

Defendants

A W CHESTERTON

ABLE SUPPLY COMPANY

ADVANCE THERMAL HYDRONICS INC (FKA THE HYDROTHERM CORPORATION)

THE HYDROTHERM CORPORATION

AJAX BOILER & HEATER CO

AJAX BOILER INC

AK STEEL CORPORATION (FKA ARMCO INC)

ARMCO INC

ALBANY INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

ALCOA WORLD ALUMINA

ALCOA INC

ALLIED CHEMICAL CORPORATION

ALLIED SIGNAL

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

AMERICAN CYNAMID COMPANY

AMERICAN STANDARD INC

AMETEK INC

AMOCO CHEMICAL COMPANY

AMOCO CORPORATION AMOCO PRODUCTION COMPANY

242 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COON, BRENT WAYNE

Defendant Attorneys

THACKSTON, ROBERT EDWIN

MCCRACKEN, CHRISTINA LEIGH

Other Attorneys

CLARY, BRIAN S.

LABOON, JOHN ANDREW

HOGAN, TIMOTHY J.

HORNE, NATHAN RAY

TIDWELL, JOHN L.

STEELE, KYLE C.

HUNTER, HAROLD HARVEY

HARTMAN, ANDREW STUART

SLAUGHTER, EDWARD MORRIS

BRADBERRY, DEBRA

RICE, B. STEVE

LEDYARD, DAVID W.

HAZEN, SCOTT PAUL

GIALLOURAKIS, NICHOLAS COSMOS

BARRON, BARBARA JANE

DE LOS SANTOS, EDDY L. JR.

FRASE, LAURA ANN

2 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2015
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HOGAN, TIMOTHY J. Person Filing - PNEUMO ABEX CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2012
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2011
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2011
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2010
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MCCRACKEN, CHRISTINA LEIGH Person Filing - NEI PARSONS LTD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2010
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MCCRACKEN, CHRISTINA LEIGH Person Filing - SIEMENS CORPORATION (INCORRECTLY SUED AS SIEMENS CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2009
  • PARTIAL REMOVAL TO BANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2008
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2008
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2008
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2007
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2006
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2006
  • AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MONTGOMERY, PAMELA W. Person Filing - MONTELLO INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CLARY, BRIAN S. Person Filing - BIRD INCORPORATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SPAIN, H. DANIEL Person Filing - ZURN INDUSTRIES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2005
  • SEVERANCE : Filing Attorney - COON, BRENT WAYNE Person Filing - HUMPHRIES, JERLINE

    Read MoreRead Less