This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/31/2020 at 07:30:01 (UTC).

HUFFMAN, STEPHANIE IRIS vs. TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY - CRIME RECORDS

Case Summary

On 07/07/2020 HUFFMAN, STEPHANIE IRIS filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY - CRIME RECORDS. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LAUREN REEDER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0094

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LAUREN REEDER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HUFFMAN, STEPHANIE IRIS

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY - CRIME RECORDS

HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLES OFFICE - PRECINCT 4

6831 Cypresswood Dr.,

Spring, TX 77379

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION - LEGAL DIVISION

205 W. 14Th St.,

Austin, TX 78701

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

Others

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING SCOTT A DURFEE

1310 Prairie 5Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

1200 Baker Street

Houston, TX 77011

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASLETT, STEPHEN A

1004 Prairie St

Houston, TX 77002

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2020
  • HearingCourt: 234; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION - LEGAL DIVISION; Issued: 7/14/2020; Tracking: 73767164; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLES OFFICE - PRECINCT 4; Issued: 7/14/2020; Tracking: 73767163; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING SCOTT A DURFEE; Issued: 7/14/2020; Tracking: 73766832; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 7/14/2020; Tracking: 73766831; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 7/14/2020; Tracking: 73766828; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 7/14/2020; Tracking: 73766827; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ASLETT, STEPHEN A; Person Filing: HUFFMAN, STEPHANIE IRIS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 7/7/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less