This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 12/11/2020 at 07:28:16 (UTC).

HUANG, KUOLIANG "JOE" vs. GOLDEN BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 11/17/2020 HUANG, KUOLIANG JOE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GOLDEN BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE H PALMER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3979

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE H PALMER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HUANG, KUOLIANG "JOE"

Defendant

GOLDEN BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Other

GOLDEN BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS

9315 Bellaire Blvd

Houston, TX 77036

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIUREK, MARK S.

 

Court Documents

Return of Service

11/23/2020: Return of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

11/17/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Plaintiffs Original Petition

11/17/2020: Plaintiffs Original Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GOLDEN BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 11/18/2020; Served: 11/20/2020; Tracking: 73812123; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SIUREK, MARK S.; Person Filing: HUANG, KUOLIANG "JOE";

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GOLDEN BANK N.A. is a litigant