This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/15/2021 at 07:19:34 (UTC).

HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR vs. RODRIGUEZ, AURELIA

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ, AURELIA. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is RABEEA COLLIER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0968

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

RABEEA COLLIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR FREMONT

Defendants

RODRIGUEZ, AURELIA

Katy, TX 77450

RODRIGUEZ, ANTONIO

Katy, TX 77450

OCCUPANT(S) OF THE PROPERTY

Katy, TX 77450

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GONZALES, ESTER DOLORES

 

Court Documents

Certified Mail Receipt

09/22/2021: Certified Mail Receipt

Certified Mail Receipt

09/22/2021: Certified Mail Receipt

Certified Mail Receipt

09/22/2021: Certified Mail Receipt

Domestic Return Receipt

09/29/2021: Domestic Return Receipt

Return Mail Undeliverable

10/12/2021: Return Mail Undeliverable

Exhibit A

09/21/2021: Exhibit A

Application For An Expedited Order Under Rule 736 On A Home Equity Loan

09/21/2021: Application For An Expedited Order Under Rule 736 On A Home Equity Loan

Citation by Certified & First Class Mail (Expedited Order Proceeding (TRC 106, 736)

09/22/2021: Citation by Certified & First Class Mail (Expedited Order Proceeding (TRC 106, 736)

Citation by Certified & First Class Mail (Expedited Order Proceeding (TRC 106, 736)

09/22/2021: Citation by Certified & First Class Mail (Expedited Order Proceeding (TRC 106, 736)

Citation by Certified & First Class Mail (Expedited Order Proceeding (TRC 106, 736)

09/22/2021: Citation by Certified & First Class Mail (Expedited Order Proceeding (TRC 106, 736)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Person: OCCUPANT(S) OF THE PROPERTY; Issued: 9/22/2021; Served: 9/22/2021; Tracking: 73918822; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Person: RODRIGUEZ, ANTONIO; Issued: 9/22/2021; Served: 9/22/2021; Tracking: 73918820; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Person: RODRIGUEZ, AURELIA; Issued: 9/22/2021; Served: 9/22/2021; Tracking: 73918819; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GONZALES, ESTER DOLORES; Person Filing: HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR FREMONT;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HSBC Bank USA, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ester Gonzales