This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/19/2020 at 07:32:52 (UTC).

HOWARD, JOSHUA vs. FUNES, DENIS

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 HOWARD, JOSHUA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FUNES, DENIS. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTINE WEEMS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1638

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

CHRISTINE WEEMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOWARD, JOSHUA

Defendants

PROJECT TELCON LLC

FUNES, DENIS

Houston, TX 77088

Other

PROJECT TELCON LLC (A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) MAY BE SERVED

3904 Ecuador Drive

Pasadena, TX 77504

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NIELSEN, ERIC DAVID

Defendant Attorney

CAREY, J. KEVIN

 

Court Documents

Citation(Denis Funes)

05/29/2020: Citation(Denis Funes)

Citation Return

06/01/2020: Citation Return

DEFENDANTS ORIGINAL ANSWER

06/15/2020: DEFENDANTS ORIGINAL ANSWER

CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST FORM

05/26/2020: CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST FORM

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/26/2020: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CAREY, J. KEVIN; Person Filing: PROJECT TELCON LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CAREY, J. KEVIN; Person Filing: FUNES, DENIS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PROJECT TELCON LLC (A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) MAY BE SERVED; Issued: 5/27/2020; Served: 5/29/2020; Tracking: 73752960; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: FUNES, DENIS; Issued: 5/27/2020; Served: 5/28/2020; Tracking: 73752957; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: NIELSEN, ERIC DAVID; Person Filing: HOWARD, JOSHUA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less