This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/31/2020 at 07:55:59 (UTC).

HOPKINS, CORLISS vs. WATSON VALVE SERVICES INC

Case Summary

On 07/07/2020 HOPKINS, CORLISS filed an Other lawsuit against WATSON VALVE SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0309

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOPKINS, CORLISS

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DETCON INC (D/B/A OLDHAM)

ARC SPECIALTIES INC

KMHJ LTD

3M COMPANY

AUTOMATION PROCESS INC

WESTERN INTERNATIONAL GAS & CYLINDERS INC

WATSON VALVE SERVICES INC

TELEDYNE DETCON INC

WATSON GRINDING AND MANUFACTURING CO

KMHJ MANAGEMENT COMPANY LLC

OLDHAM

AUTOMATION PLUS INC

TRCC LLC

MATHESON TRI-GAS INC

FIRESTONE CRYOGENIC EQUIPMENT INC

DATAONLINE LLC

INDUSTRIAL SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION

Defendants and Cross Defendants

WATSON VALVE SERVICES INC

WATSON GRINDING AND MANUFACTURING CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GALINDO, CRISTOBAL M

4151 Southwest

Houston, TX 77027

Defendant Attorneys

TURNER, ROBERT CRAIG

17070 Dallas Par

Dallas, TX 75248

LAVIGNE, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL

2200 Ross Ave.

Dallas, TX 75201

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LOVETT, MARY OLGA

1000 Louisiana

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

Original Answer of Defendants KNHJ Ltd and KMHJ Management Company LLC.

07/14/2020: Original Answer of Defendants KNHJ Ltd and KMHJ Management Company LLC.

Western International Gas and Cylinders Inc and Matheson Tri-Gas Inc.'s Original Answer.

07/16/2020: Western International Gas and Cylinders Inc and Matheson Tri-Gas Inc.'s Original Answer.

Notice of Removal

07/27/2020: Notice of Removal

Plaintiff's Original Petition

07/07/2020: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Matheson & Western Crossclaim against Watson Defendants

07/08/2020: Matheson & Western Crossclaim against Watson Defendants

Exhibit 3

07/08/2020: Exhibit 3

Exhibit 2

07/08/2020: Exhibit 2

Exhibit 1

07/08/2020: Exhibit 1

Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition.

07/08/2020: Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LAVIGNE, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL; Person Filing: WESTERN INTERNATIONAL GAS & CYLINDERS INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LAVIGNE, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL; Person Filing: MATHESON TRI-GAS INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: TURNER, ROBERT CRAIG; Person Filing: KMHJ LTD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: TURNER, ROBERT CRAIG; Person Filing: KMHJ MANAGEMENT COMPANY LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: CROSS ACTION; Filing Attorney: LOVETT, MARY OLGA; Person Filing: MATHESON TRI-GAS INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: CROSS ACTION; Filing Attorney: LOVETT, MARY OLGA; Person Filing: WESTERN INTERNATIONAL GAS & CYLINDERS INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GALINDO, CRISTOBAL M; Person Filing: HOPKINS, CORLISS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GALINDO, CRISTOBAL M; Person Filing: HOPKINS, CORLISS;

    Read MoreRead Less