This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 01/16/2020 at 07:25:43 (UTC).

HOP CAPITAL vs. AMERICORE HEALTH

Case Summary

On 12/23/2019 HOP CAPITAL filed an Other lawsuit against AMERICORE HEALTH. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is CORY SEPOLIO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9776

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

CORY SEPOLIO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOP CAPITAL

Defendants

ST. ALEXIUS PROPERTIES, LLC

WHITE, GRANT

AMERICORE HOLDINGS LLC

PINEVILLE MEDICAL CENTER LLC DBA SOUTHEASTERN KENTUCKY MEDICAL CENTER

ST. ALEXIUS HOSPITAL CORPORATION #1

ELLWOOD MEDICAL CENTER OPERATIONS LLC

AMERICORE HEALTH

ELLWOOD MEDICAL CENTER LLC

PINEVILLE MEDICAL CENTER LLC DBA SOUTHEASTERN KENTUCKY MEDICAL CENTER LL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REGENT, ANH HUYNH

3601 Audubon Pl

Houston, TX 77006

 

Court Documents

Proposed Agreed Judgment

12/27/2019: Proposed Agreed Judgment

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

12/23/2019: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

Partial Release of Judgment

01/08/2020: Partial Release of Judgment

AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

01/06/2020: AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 1/6/2020;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: NO COSTS ALLOCATED;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketDescription: HOLD FOR JUDGMENT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: REGENT, ANH HUYNH; Person Filing: HOP CAPITAL;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ST ALEXIUS HOSPITAL CORPORATION #1 is a litigant

Latest cases where ELLWOOD MEDICAL CENTER OPERATIONS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Americore Health, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HOP CAPITAL is a litigant