Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/12/2020 at 11:49:41 (UTC).

HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION OF RETREAT AT CHAMPIONS LANDING INC vs. ALLEN, CLARA M

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION OF RETREAT AT CHAMPIONS LANDING INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ALLEN, CLARA M. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DONNA ROTH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9577

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DONNA ROTH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION OF RETREAT AT CHAMPIONS LA

HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION OF RETREAT AT CHAMPIONS LANDING INC

Defendants

ALLEN, CLARA M

Houston, TX 77069

ALLEN, JOYCE

Houston, TX 77069

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRAN, THI ANH

5051 Westheimer

Houston, TX 77056

 

Court Documents

Proposed Order

05/13/2020: Proposed Order

Exhibit B

05/13/2020: Exhibit B

Exhibit A

05/13/2020: Exhibit A

Plaintiff's Motion for Substituted Service:

05/13/2020: Plaintiff's Motion for Substituted Service:

ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SIGNED

05/15/2020: ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SIGNED

Citation- Joyce Allen

06/10/2020: Citation- Joyce Allen

Citation- Allen, Clara M

06/10/2020: Citation- Allen, Clara M

Allen--Request for Issuance

04/15/2020: Allen--Request for Issuance

Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Declaratory Relief

03/26/2020: Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Declaratory Relief

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SIGNED; Order Signed: 5/15/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ALLEN, JOYCE; Issued: 4/16/2020; Served: 5/20/2020; Tracking: 73742887; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ALLEN, CLARA M; Issued: 4/16/2020; Served: 5/20/2020; Tracking: 73742886; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: TRAN, THI ANH; Person Filing: HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION OF RETREAT AT CHAMPIONS LANDING INC;

    Read MoreRead Less