This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 03/19/2021 at 08:19:39 (UTC).

HOLLINS, STEFANIE vs. BALKAN EXPRESS LLC

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 HOLLINS, STEFANIE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BALKAN EXPRESS LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MIKE ENGELHART. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0318

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MIKE ENGELHART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOLLINS, STEFANIE

Defendant

BALKAN EXPRESS LLC

Others

BALKAN EXPRESS LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT

7312 Rock Garden Trail Fort

Worth, TX 76123

BALKAN EXPRESS LLC (DOMESTIC LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) MAY BE SERVED

7312 Rock Garden Trail Fort

Worth, TX 76123

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CRIACO, ADAM P.

 

Court Documents

Plaintiffs Original Petition

02/23/2021: Plaintiffs Original Petition

Civil Process Request

02/23/2021: Civil Process Request

Plaintiff's First Amended Petition

03/10/2021: Plaintiff's First Amended Petition

Civil Process Request

03/10/2021: Civil Process Request

Exhibit A

03/10/2021: Exhibit A

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (SECRETARY OF STATE); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BALKAN EXPRESS LLC (DOMESTIC LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) MAY BE SERVED; Issued: 3/17/2021; Tracking: 73851361; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CRIACO, ADAM P.; Person Filing: HOLLINS, STEFANIE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BALKAN EXPRESS LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT; Issued: 2/24/2021; Tracking: 73843884; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CRIACO, ADAM P.; Person Filing: HOLLINS, STEFANIE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less