This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:27:59 (UTC).

HOLDEN, LIVINGSTON LEE JR vs. TEXACO INC

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 HOLDEN, LIVINGSTON LEE JR filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against TEXACO INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8702

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOLDEN, LIVINGSTON LEE JR

Defendants

TEXACO INC

AIR LIGUIDE AMERICA CORP

ALLIED CHEMICAL CORP

ALLIEDSIGNAL INC

AMERIPOL SYNPOL CORP

AMOCO CHEMICAL CO

AMOCO OIL CO

ARCO CHEMICAL CO

ATLANTIC RICHFIELD CO

B A S F CORP

B F GOODRICH CORP

B P EXPLORATION & OIL CO

B P OIL CORP

BASIS PETROLEUM INC

BEAZER EAST INC

BEAZER MATERIALS & SERVICES INC

BIG THREE INDUSTRIES INC

BRIDGESTONE FIRESTONE INC

CANADIANOXY OFFSHORE PRODUCTION CO

64 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GIBLIN, AARYN KEMP

Defendant Attorney

KROGER, BILL

Other Attorneys

GARDNER, STEPHEN SHAYNE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2012
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, FINAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2005
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2005
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2005
  • AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GARDNER, STEPHEN SHAYNE Person Filing - MOBILE OIL REFINING CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2005
  • AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GARDNER, STEPHEN SHAYNE Person Filing - MOBILE CHEMICAL CO INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GIBLIN, AARYN KEMP Person Filing - HOLDEN, LIVINGSTON LEE JR

    Read MoreRead Less