This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:04:42 (UTC).

HOFFMAN, JAMES KURT vs. GARCIA, ANNE MARCHAND

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 HOFFMAN, JAMES KURT filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GARCIA, ANNE MARCHAND. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8019

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

HOFFMAN, JAMES KURT

GARCIA, ANNE MARCHAND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

HINCHMAN, GARY A.

LEWIS, GEORGE L. JR.

LEWIS, GEORGE L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2005
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED CHANGING NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2005
  • TEMPORARY ORD SIGNED WITHOUT CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2005
  • COUNTER CLAIM : Filing Attorney - LEWIS, GEORGE L. Person Filing - GARCIA, ANNE MARCHAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LEWIS, GEORGE L. Person Filing - GARCIA, ANNE MARCHAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2004
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HINCHMAN, GARY A. Person Filing - HOFFMAN, JAMES KURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HINCHMAN, GARY A. Person Filing - HOFFMAN, JAMES KURT

    Read MoreRead Less