Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/15/2015 at 01:18:43 (UTC).

HILTON, KENNETH W vs. AMERICAN OPTICAL CORP

Case Summary

On 02/03/2005 HILTON, KENNETH W filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against AMERICAN OPTICAL CORP. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7277

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

HILTON, DEBORAH L

WILLIAMS, DON

WILLIAMS, MARY ELIZABETH

IMO INDUSTRIES INC

KELLY MOORE PAINT COMPANY

CAPCO PIPE COMPANY INC

CROWN CORK AND SEAL COMPANY INC

ENGINEERS AND FABRICATORS COMPANY

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

HILTON, KENNETH W

BLUM, PAT

BLUM, BARBARA

HILTON, MARK G

HILTON, DEBRA ALTA

SMITH, ROBERT

AMERICAN OPTICAL CORP

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION (DBA UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS AND PLASTICS

UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS AND PLASTICS INC

WYATT INDUSTRIES, INC.

ANY AND ALL DEFENDANTS IN PLAINTIFFS PETITION OR AMENDMENTS THERETO OR

80 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

CLOUD, IAN PATRICK

COLE, RYAN GRANT

WADE, TODD N.

LACKEY, DOUG

STUART, KIMBERLY ROSE

CLARY, BRIAN S.

RHODES, KENNETH D.

PRAZAK, JONATHAN R

POWERS, JAMES H.

BLAZEK, PAULA H

BERLANGA, JOSE A.

Other Attorneys

STEVENS, RAYMOND LYN

BAILEY, MELVIN DAVID

CALDERON, RAUL M.

OLD, JAMES ROWLAND JR.

WHITE, CLAY M.

ELLISTON, GARY D.

FRASE, LAURA ANN

BEAN, FRANK M.

MORFEY, LISA E

20 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2015
  • PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • PARTIES ADMIN CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
117 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2005
  • MOTION TRANSFER VENUE : Filing Attorney - BLAZEK, PAULA H Person Filing - UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION (DBA UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS AND PLASTICS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CLOUD, IAN PATRICK Person Filing - HILTON, DEBORAH L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CLOUD, IAN PATRICK Person Filing - BLUM, PAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CLOUD, IAN PATRICK Person Filing - BLUM, BARBARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CLOUD, IAN PATRICK Person Filing - HILTON, MARK G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CLOUD, IAN PATRICK Person Filing - WILLIAMS, MARY ELIZABETH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CLOUD, IAN PATRICK Person Filing - SMITH, ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CLOUD, IAN PATRICK Person Filing - WILLIAMS, DON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CLOUD, IAN PATRICK Person Filing - HILTON, KENNETH W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CLOUD, IAN PATRICK Person Filing - HILTON, DEBRA ALTA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENGINEERS AND FABRICATORS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CAPCO PIPE COMPANY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where IMO INDUSTRIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION is a litigant