This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 08/14/2022 at 07:41:43 (UTC).

HILLIARD, HAROLD vs. HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 HILLIARD, HAROLD filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are FREDERICKA PHILLIPS and RAVI K. SANDILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3842

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

FREDERICKA PHILLIPS

RAVI K. SANDILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HILLIARD, HAROLD

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

HARRIS COUNTY CSCD

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE ? CJAD

Lee Downing,

Austin, TX 78701

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION

UNITED STATES PROBATION OFFICE

Po Box 61207,

Houston, TX 77008

Others

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING

1310 Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING

1310 Prairie 5Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING

1200 Baker Street

Houston, TX 77011

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING

102 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY COMMUNIITY SUPERVISION & CORRECTIONS BY SERVING

49 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION BY SERVING

205 W. 14Th Street Ste 600

Austin, TX 78701

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2022
  • HearingCourt: 061; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION (MOTION FOR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: UNITED STATES PROBATION OFFICE; Issued: 8/8/2022; Tracking: 74035828; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE ? CJAD; Issued: 8/8/2022; Tracking: 74035827; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 8/8/2022; Tracking: 74029437; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION BY SERVING; Issued: 8/8/2022; Tracking: 74029436; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY COMMUNIITY SUPERVISION & CORRECTIONS BY SERVING; Issued: 8/8/2022; Tracking: 74029435; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING; Issued: 8/8/2022; Tracking: 74029433; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING; Issued: 8/8/2022; Tracking: 74029432; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING; Issued: 8/8/2022; Tracking: 74029427; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING; Issued: 8/8/2022; Tracking: 74029424; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED; Order Signed: 7/28/2022;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 7/25/2022;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: HILLIARD, HAROLD;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS DEPARMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY CSCD is a litigant

Latest cases where Texas Department of Criminal Justice - Parole Division is a litigant

Latest cases where OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION - LEGAL DIVISION is a litigant