This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 11/24/2022 at 08:05:32 (UTC).

HILL, DAWN vs. AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC

Case Summary

On 10/31/2022 HILL, DAWN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AMAZON COM SERVICES LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is RABEEA COLLIER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1510

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

RABEEA COLLIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HILL, DAWN

Defendants

AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC

CATCHINGS, JESSEKA CAINE

Other

AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC (FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) MAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHNS, CHRISTOPHER KELLEY

 

Court Documents

Plaintiffs Original Petition

10/31/2022: Plaintiffs Original Petition

Return of Service-AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC

11/14/2022: Return of Service-AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC

Return of Service-served-CATCHINGS, JESSEKA CAINE

11/17/2022: Return of Service-served-CATCHINGS, JESSEKA CAINE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CATCHINGS, JESSEKA CAINE; Issued: 11/9/2022; Served: 10/16/2022; Received: 11/17/2022; Tracking: 74075824; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC (FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) MAY; Issued: 11/9/2022; Served: 11/14/2022; Tracking: 74075820; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: JOHNS, CHRISTOPHER KELLEY; Person Filing: HILL, DAWN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less