This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/19/2020 at 07:37:57 (UTC).

HERRINGTON, CHRISTIE (INDIVIDUALLY AND A/N/F OF CXXXXX HXXXXXXXXX) vs. GENIUS ACADEMY LLC (D/B/A KIDS R KIDS 42 TX)

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 HERRINGTON, CHRISTIE INDIVIDUALLY AND A/N/F OF CXXXXX HXXXXXXXXX filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GENIUS ACADEMY LLC D/B/A KIDS R KIDS 42 TX. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTINE WEEMS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1708

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

CHRISTINE WEEMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HXXXXXXXXX, CXXXXX

HERRINGTON, CHRISTIE (INDIVIDUALLY AND A/N/F OF CXXXXX HXXXXXXXXX)

Defendants

GENIUS ACADEMY LLC (D/B/A KIDS R KIDS 42 TX)

KIDS R KIDS 42 TX

Guardian Ad Litem

MERIWETHER, SYDNEY IGLEHEART

Houston, TX 77027

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CANTRELL, SHARON SIMMONS

9821 Katy Freew

Houston, TX 77024

Defendant Attorney

MILLER,DAVID L

6525 Washington

Houston, TX 77007

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM GRANTED

06/03/2020: ORDER TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM GRANTED

LETTER TO CLERK

05/26/2020: LETTER TO CLERK

Proposed Order Agreed Motion To Appoint Guardian Ad Litem For Minor Plaintiff

05/27/2020: Proposed Order Agreed Motion To Appoint Guardian Ad Litem For Minor Plaintiff

Correspondence

05/27/2020: Correspondence

Agreed Motion To Appoint Guardian Ad Litem For Minor Plaintiff

05/27/2020: Agreed Motion To Appoint Guardian Ad Litem For Minor Plaintiff

Defendnat's Original Answer

05/27/2020: Defendnat's Original Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM GRANTED; Order Signed: 6/3/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MILLER,DAVID L; Person Filing: KIDS R KIDS 42 TX;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MILLER,DAVID L; Person Filing: GENIUS ACADEMY LLC (D/B/A KIDS R KIDS 42 TX);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CANTRELL, SHARON SIMMONS; Person Filing: HERRINGTON, CHRISTIE (INDIVIDUALLY AND A/N/F OF CXXXXX HXXXXXXXXX);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CANTRELL, SHARON SIMMONS; Person Filing: HXXXXXXXXX, CXXXXX;

    Read MoreRead Less