This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/02/2021 at 07:25:44 (UTC).

HERRERA, JACKELINE vs. HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT ATTN: EXPUNCTIO

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 HERRERA, JACKELINE filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT ATTN EXPUNCTIO. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is RABEEA COLLIER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4383

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

RABEEA COLLIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERRERA, JACKELINE

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT ATTN: EXPUNCTIO

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY CRIME RECORDS SERVICE MSC 0234

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION ATTENTION: E-FILE & RE: SEARCHTX

205 W. 14Th Street,

Austin, TX 78701

SOUTHEAST TEXAS CRIME INFORMATION CENTER (SETCIC) ATTN: EXPUNCTION

Others

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

1200 Baker St

Houston, TX 77011

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Houston, TX 78765

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L ROSE

1310 Prairie, 5Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

COMMUNITY SUPERVISION & CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR. TERESA MAY PHD

102 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY PRE-TRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR

102 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

SOUTHEAST TEXAS CRIME INFORMATION CENTER BY SERVING MIKE GIORDANELLI

406 Caroline

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORGAN, STACEY L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2021
  • HearingCourt: 113; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION ATTENTION: E-FILE & RE: SEARCHTX; Issued: 6/16/2021; Tracking: 73880830; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SOUTHEAST TEXAS CRIME INFORMATION CENTER BY SERVING MIKE GIORDANELLI; Issued: 6/16/2021; Tracking: 73880825; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY PRE-TRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR; Issued: 6/16/2021; Tracking: 73880821; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: COMMUNITY SUPERVISION & CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR. TERESA MAY PHD; Issued: 6/16/2021; Tracking: 73880820; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 6/16/2021; Tracking: 73880819; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 6/16/2021; Tracking: 73880818; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 6/16/2021; Tracking: 73880817; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L ROSE; Issued: 6/16/2021; Tracking: 73880815; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 6/16/2021; Tracking: 73880813; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 6/16/2021; Tracking: 73880811; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 6/11/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MORGAN, STACEY L; Person Filing: HERRERA, JACKELINE;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHEAST TEXAS CRIME INFORMATION CENTER (SETCIC) ATTN: EXPUNCTION is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT is a litigant