This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 03/21/2021 at 07:30:34 (UTC).

HERRERA, CARMEN vs. 99 CENTS ONLY STORES LLC

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 HERRERA, CARMEN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 99 CENTS ONLY STORES LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is RAVI K. SANDILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0903

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

RAVI K. SANDILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERRERA, CARMEN

Defendants

99 CENTS ONLY STORES LLC

99 CENTS ONLY STORES TEXAS INC

Others

99 CENTS ONLY STORES TEXAS INC (A FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY)

1999 Bryan St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

99 CENTS ONLY STORES LLC (A FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) MAY BE

1999 Bryan St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LESKE, JOSHUA ROBERT

Defendant Attorney

GRIFFIN, MICHAEL JOHN III

 

Court Documents

Defendant's Original Answer, Demand for Jury Trial and RFD to Plaintiff

03/11/2021: Defendant's Original Answer, Demand for Jury Trial and RFD to Plaintiff

Return of Service (99 CENTS ONLY STORES TEXAS INC)

03/11/2021: Return of Service (99 CENTS ONLY STORES TEXAS INC)

Return of Service (99CENTS ONLY STORES LLC)

03/11/2021: Return of Service (99CENTS ONLY STORES LLC)

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

02/25/2021: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

02/25/2021: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

02/25/2021: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GRIFFIN, MICHAEL JOHN III; Person Filing: 99 CENTS ONLY STORES TEXAS INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GRIFFIN, MICHAEL JOHN III; Person Filing: 99 CENTS ONLY STORES LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: 99 CENTS ONLY STORES TEXAS INC (A FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY); Issued: 2/25/2021; Served: 3/8/2021; Tracking: 73844350; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: 99 CENTS ONLY STORES LLC (A FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) MAY BE; Issued: 2/25/2021; Served: 3/8/2021; Tracking: 73844345; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LESKE, JOSHUA ROBERT; Person Filing: HERRERA, CARMEN;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 99 Cents Only Stores Texas, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua R. Leske