This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/19/2020 at 07:35:54 (UTC).

HENRY, CHARIESE vs. WAL-MART STORES TEXAS LLC

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 HENRY, CHARIESE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WAL-MART STORES TEXAS LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DEDRA DAVIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1684

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DEDRA DAVIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HENRY, CHARIESE

Defendant

WAL-MART STORES TEXAS LLC

Other

WAL-MART STORES TEXAS LLC (A DOMESTIC CORPORATION) BY SERVING ITS

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DASPIT, JOHN

 

Court Documents

Citation Return-Wal Mart Stores Texas LLC

06/09/2020: Citation Return-Wal Mart Stores Texas LLC

Plaintiffs Original Petition and First Set of discovery Requests

05/26/2020: Plaintiffs Original Petition and First Set of discovery Requests

Request for Issuance of Service

05/26/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Plaintiffs Original Petition and First Set of Discovery Requests

05/26/2020: Plaintiffs Original Petition and First Set of Discovery Requests

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: WAL-MART STORES TEXAS LLC (A DOMESTIC CORPORATION) BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 5/27/2020; Served: 6/1/2020; Tracking: 73752932; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DASPIT, JOHN; Person Filing: HENRY, CHARIESE;

    Read MoreRead Less