Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 05/11/2015 at 10:43:47 (UTC).

HENDRICKS, BOYD W vs. UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/27/2004 HENDRICKS, BOYD W filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2404

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2004

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

HENDRICKS, BOYD W

HENDRICKS, BOYD WILLIAM

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION (DBA UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION CHEMICALS

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION CHEMICALS AND PLASTICS

GARLAND INC

A K STEEL CORPORATION (AKA ARMCO INC AND ARMCO STEEL CORPORATION)

ARMCO INC

ARMCO STEEL CORPORATION

A M F INCORPORATED

AQUA CHEM INC (DBA CLEAVER BROOKS DIVISION)

CLEAVER BROOKS DIVISION

AUSTIN

BABCOCK BORSIG POWER INC (FKA DB RILEY INC FKA RILEY STOKER

DB RILEY INC

RILEY STOKER CORPORATION

BECHTEL CORPORATION (FKA BECHTEL CIVIL & MINERALS INC FKA BECHTEL

BECTHEL CIVIL & MINERALS INC

BECHTEL CIVIL INC

39 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

PARTIDA-KIPNESS, ROBBIE S.

ANDREWS, PATRICIA KAY

ELLISTON, GARY D.

LEVINE, TORI SMITH

WHITE, CLAY M.

WATSON, CHARLES A.

HAMILTON, PAUL EDWARD

ARREDONDO, ROBERT DAVID

Other Attorneys

CALDERON, RAUL M.

LOWERY, JAMES A. III

FOLEY, JAMES THOMAS III

ADAMS, KENT M.

SMITH, J. MICHAEL

WADE, TODD N.

WILSON, JACKSON D. II

FUNDERBURK, LARRY B.

HOGAN, TIMOTHY J.

EDWARDS, BRADY SHERROD

SHEEHY, RICHARD A.

BARRON, BARBARA JANE

6 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2008
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2005
  • ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - PAPPAS, GEORGE P. Person Filing - FBCO INC (FKA NATKIN SERVICE COMPANY FKA NATKIN SERVICE COMPANY OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2005
  • ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - PAPPAS, GEORGE P. Person Filing - NATKIN SERVICE COMPANY OF KANSAS CITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2005
  • ORDER FOR AGREED PARTIAL JUDGMENT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2005
  • SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - COLLEY, CHRISTOPHER CHAMBLIS Person Filing - HENDRICKS, BOYD W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2005
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - ANDREWS, PATRICIA KAY Person Filing - GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2005
  • ANSWER ALL CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - ANDREWS, PATRICIA KAY Person Filing - GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ANDREWS, PATRICIA KAY Person Filing - GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FUNDERBURK, LARRY B. Person Filing - MUNDY INDUSTRIAL MAINTENANCE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ELLISTON, GARY D. Person Filing - UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION CHEMICALS AND PLASTICS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ELLISTON, GARY D. Person Filing - DANA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ELLISTON, GARY D. Person Filing - UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION (DBA UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION CHEMICALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LEVINE, TORI SMITH Person Filing - A M F INCORPORATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MASTON, KAREN KAY Person Filing - AMETEK INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HOGAN, TIMOTHY J. Person Filing - QUIGLEY COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GROSWITH, JENNAFER GAYLE Person Filing - GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES LLC (FKA GARLAND INC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HOGAN, TIMOTHY J. Person Filing - PFIZER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - PARTIDA-KIPNESS, ROBBIE S. Person Filing - HENDRICKS, BOYD W

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GARLAND INC is a litigant

Latest cases where AUSTIN CO is a litigant

Latest cases where ARMCO INC is a litigant

Latest cases where BECHTEL CIVIL & MINERALS INC is a litigant