This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:12:12 (UTC).

HARTFORD STEAM BOILER INSPECTION AND INS vs. FLOWSERVE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 HARTFORD STEAM BOILER INSPECTION AND INS filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against FLOWSERVE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8485

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HARTFORD STEAM BOILER INSPECTION AND INSURANCE COMPANY (AS SUBROGEE

HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT #61

Defendant

TEJAS CONSTRUCTION COMPANY (TEXAS CORPORATION)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOHN, JON P.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2006
  • REINSTATEMENT ON COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2006
  • MOTION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2006
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2006
  • DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2006
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING REFERRAL TO MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2006
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2006
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2006
  • DEFENDANT COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2005
  • ORDER FOR AGREED PARTIAL JUDGMENT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2005
  • CASE REMOVED FROM HOLD FOR JUDGMENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - NEUER, RAY Person Filing - FLOWSERVE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BOHN, JON P. Person Filing - HARTFORD STEAM BOILER INSPECTION AND INSURANCE COMPANY (AS SUBROGEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GARCIA, ERNEST C. Person Filing - ALSAY INCORPORATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - NEUER, RAY Person Filing - BW/IP INTERNATIONAL INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - NEUER, RAY Person Filing - BW/IP INTERNATIONAL INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2005
  • ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - NEUER, RAY Person Filing - BORG WARNER CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2004
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - NEUER, RAY Person Filing - FLOWSERVE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BOHN, JON P. Person Filing - HARTFORD STEAM BOILER INSPECTION AND INSURANCE COMPANY (AS SUBROGEE

    Read MoreRead Less