This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/17/2022 at 07:28:43 (UTC).

HARRIS COUNTY vs. THOMAS, DONNA R

Case Summary

On 09/23/2022 HARRIS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against THOMAS, DONNA R. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERICKA PHILLIPS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1076

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERICKA PHILLIPS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HARRIS COUNTY

LONE STAR COLLEGE SYSTEM DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 01

HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 24

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

Defendants

THOMAS, DONNA R

Houston, TX 77002

CAPITAL BANK (A FINANCIAL INSTITUTION) (IN REM ONLY)

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (IN REM ONLY)

Others

CAPITAL BANK (A FINANCIAL INSTITUTION) (IN REM ONLY) BY SERVING ITS

10304 East Fwy

Houston, TX 77029

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (IN REM ONLY) BY SERVING

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PENA READE, CINTHYA

 

Court Documents

Original Petition

09/23/2022: Original Petition

Citation

09/23/2022: Citation

Citation

09/23/2022: Citation

Citation

09/23/2022: Citation

Citation

10/05/2022: Citation

Citation

09/30/2022: Citation

Citation

09/30/2022: Citation

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (IN REM ONLY) BY SERVING; Issued: 9/27/2022; Served: 9/29/2022; Returned: 9/29/2022; Tracking: 74056837; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CAPITAL BANK (A FINANCIAL INSTITUTION) (IN REM ONLY) BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 9/27/2022; Served: 9/30/2022; Returned: 10/3/2022; Tracking: 74056836; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: THOMAS, DONNA R; Issued: 9/27/2022; Returned: 9/29/2022; Tracking: 74056835; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PENA READE, CINTHYA; Person Filing: PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PENA READE, CINTHYA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PENA READE, CINTHYA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PENA READE, CINTHYA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PENA READE, CINTHYA; Person Filing: LONE STAR COLLEGE SYSTEM DISTRICT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PENA READE, CINTHYA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PENA READE, CINTHYA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 24;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PENA READE, CINTHYA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 01;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where Lone Star College System is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCE SERVICES DISTRICT #12 is a litigant