This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 05/08/2022 at 07:24:27 (UTC).

HARRIS COUNTY vs. SHAUN REAL ESTATE ENTERPRISES LLC (A TEXAS LIMITED

Case Summary

On 04/14/2022 HARRIS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against SHAUN REAL ESTATE ENTERPRISES LLC A TEXAS LIMITED. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is URSULA A. HALL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2776

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

URSULA A. HALL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HARRIS COUNTY

CITY OF HOUSTON

HOUSTON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

HOUSTON COMMUNITY COLLEGE SYSTEM

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

Defendants and Others

SHAUN REAL ESTATE ENTERPRISES LLC (A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY)

9900 Spectrum Drive

Austin, TX 78717

UNKNOWN MEMBERS SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS OF SHAUN REAL ESTATE

JANI GROUP LLC (A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY)

JANI GROUP LLC (A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) BY SERVING ITS

7 Beaver Tail Point

Houston, TX 77024

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA

 

Court Documents

Original Petition

04/14/2022: Original Petition

Citation

04/14/2022: Citation

Citation

04/14/2022: Citation

Citation

04/27/2022: Citation

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: JANI GROUP LLC (A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 4/19/2022; Served: 4/25/2022; Returned: 4/26/2022; Tracking: 73996150; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SHAUN REAL ESTATE ENTERPRISES LLC (A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY); Issued: 4/19/2022; Tracking: 73996148; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: CITY OF HOUSTON;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HOUSTON COMMUNITY COLLEGE SYSTEM;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HOUSTON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less