Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 11/21/2020 at 22:47:57 (UTC).

HARRIS COUNTY vs. RIVON, LEONARD JR

Case Summary

On 07/13/2015 HARRIS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against RIVON, LEONARD JR. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is BEAU MILLER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0054

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

BEAU MILLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARRIS COUNTY

Intervenor Plaintiffs

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT AND LEE COLLEGE

CITY OF BAYTOWN

Defendants and Intervenor Defendants

RIVON, LEONARD JR

Liberty, TX 77575

RIVON, JO ANN ( AKA JOANN ANN RIVON )

RIVON, JOANN ANN

Liberty, TX 77575

RIVON, PAUL (IN REM ONLY)

FINNELS, JOANN RIVON (IN REM ONLY)

RIVON, TIOMOTHY JACKIE (IN REM ONLY)

DEVER, VANESSA RIVON (IN REM ONLY)

RIVON, LARRY (IN REM ONLY)

RIVON, BOBBY RHODA (IN REM ONLY)

RIVON, LEONARD JR (DECEASED)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WATKINS, EMILY KING

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorneys

BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC

STRONG, RANDALL B.

Defendant Attorney

RICHARDS, MALCOLM RUNNELS

 

Court Documents

Citation

07/13/2015: Citation

Citation

07/13/2015: Citation

EXHIBIT A

07/28/2015: EXHIBIT A

Letter Requesting Issuance Of Service

08/01/2016: Letter Requesting Issuance Of Service

Proposed Order Appointing Attorney AD Litem

09/08/2016: Proposed Order Appointing Attorney AD Litem

MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM

09/08/2016: MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM

NOTICE OF POSSIBLE INTEREST HOLDERS

02/07/2017: NOTICE OF POSSIBLE INTEREST HOLDERS

Intervenors first ameneded petition

02/21/2017: Intervenors first ameneded petition

Letter Requesting Issuance of Service

02/23/2017: Letter Requesting Issuance of Service

Letter Requesting Issuance of Service

02/23/2017: Letter Requesting Issuance of Service

AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM FOR: LEONARD RIVON JR AND UNKNOWN HEIRS

03/03/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM FOR: LEONARD RIVON JR AND UNKNOWN HEIRS

Citation

03/15/2017: Citation

Citation

03/15/2017: Citation

Citation

03/27/2017: Citation

Citation

03/27/2017: Citation

Exhibit B

04/05/2017: Exhibit B

Notice of Trial

04/13/2017: Notice of Trial

Request for Order of Sale in Tax Suit

09/29/2017: Request for Order of Sale in Tax Suit

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketType of Service: ORDER OF SALE (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: EXECUTION ORDER OF SALE; Person: RIVON, LEONARD JR; Issued: 10/3/2017; Served: 3/6/2018; Tracking: 73419432; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DocketDescription: ORDER GRANTING STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE SIGNED; Order Signed: 8/24/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DocketDescription: FEE AWARDED TO ATTORNEY AD LITEM; Order Signed: 8/24/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SGND GRANTING SALE OF PROPERTY; Order Signed: 8/11/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketDescription: FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY); Order Signed: 8/11/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketDescription: INTERLOCUTORY DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Order Signed: 8/11/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketDescription: DEFENDANT COSTS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketDescription: MASTER'S REPORT SIGNED; Order Signed: 8/11/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • DocketDescription: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RECOMMENDED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • DocketDescription: ATTORNEY FEES RECOMMENDED;

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2016
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM GRANTED; Order Signed: 12/5/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • DocketDescription: APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM RECOMMENDED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • DocketDescription: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • HearingCourt: 555; Docket Type: Tax Docket (Trial); Reason: AD LITEM APPOINTMENT ATTORNEY; Results: Heard (No Ruling Made); Requesting Party: STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • DocketDescription: MOTION TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM HEARD NO RULING MADE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • DocketType of Service: PUBLICATION (TAX); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: RIVON, LEONARD JR; Issued: 8/5/2016; Served: 8/9/2016; Returned: 8/17/2016; Received: 8/19/2016; Tracking: 73274200; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT AND LEE COLLEGE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: RIVON, JOANN ANN; Issued: 7/14/2015; Tracking: 73148729; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: RIVON, LEONARD JR; Issued: 7/14/2015; Returned: 7/30/2015; Tracking: 73148728; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WATKINS, EMILY KING; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED ISD is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY is a litigant