This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/18/2022 at 07:21:27 (UTC).

HARRIS COUNTY vs. REYES, FERNANDO

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 HARRIS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against REYES, FERNANDO. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is RAVI K. SANDILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7835

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

RAVI K. SANDILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HARRIS COUNTY

LONE STAR COLLEGE SYSTEM DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 01

HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 25

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

Intervenor Plaintiff

ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOL DISTRICT

Intervenor Defendants and Defendants

REYES, FERNANDO

Humble, TX 77396

RAMOS, JOSE LUIS (IN REM ONLY)

Houston, TX 77084

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorney

RAMIREZ, ANNETTE

 

Court Documents

Original Petition

06/24/2022: Original Petition

Citation

06/24/2022: Citation

Citation

06/24/2022: Citation

INTERVENOR'S ORIGINAL PETITION

07/13/2022: INTERVENOR'S ORIGINAL PETITION

Exhibit "A"

07/13/2022: Exhibit "A"

Citation/Return of Service

07/11/2022: Citation/Return of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: RAMIREZ, ANNETTE; Person Filing: ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: RAMOS, JOSE LUIS (IN REM ONLY); Issued: 6/24/2022; Tracking: 74020064; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: REYES, FERNANDO; Issued: 6/24/2022; Served: 7/6/2022; Returned: 7/6/2022; Tracking: 74020062; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 25;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN; Person Filing: PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 01;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN; Person Filing: LONE STAR COLLEGE SYSTEM DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where Lone Star College System is a litigant