This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 05/19/2022 at 07:21:07 (UTC).

HARRIS COUNTY vs. PRICE, JOHN LEE (JR)

Case Summary

On 04/25/2022 HARRIS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against PRICE, JOHN LEE JR. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is RABEEA COLLIER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4566

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

RABEEA COLLIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HARRIS COUNTY

CITY OF HOUSTON

HOUSTON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

HOUSTON COMMUNITY COLLEGE SYSTEM

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

Defendants and Others

PRICE, JOHN LEE (JR)

Houston, TX 77091

BURLEY, TINA YVETTE

City, TX 77489

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (IN REM ONLY)

CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA) N A (NOW MERGED INTO CITIBANK N A) (A

5800 S Corporate Pl Sioux

Falls, SD 57108

MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP (A NEVADA CORPORATION) (IN REM ONLY)

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (IN REM ONLY) BY SERVING JENNIFER B LOWERY

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA

 

Court Documents

Citation

05/10/2022: Citation

Citation

05/09/2022: Citation

Citation

05/02/2022: Citation

Original Petition

04/25/2022: Original Petition

Citation

04/25/2022: Citation

Citation

04/25/2022: Citation

Citation

04/25/2022: Citation

Citation

04/25/2022: Citation

Citation

04/25/2022: Citation

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP (A NEVADA CORPORATION) (IN REM ONLY); Issued: 4/25/2022; Served: 5/4/2022; Tracking: 73998742; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA) N A (NOW MERGED INTO CITIBANK N A) (A; Issued: 4/25/2022; Tracking: 73998741; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (IN REM ONLY) BY SERVING JENNIFER B LOWERY; Issued: 4/25/2022; Served: 5/5/2022; Returned: 5/6/2022; Tracking: 73998740; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BURLEY, TINA YVETTE; Issued: 4/25/2022; Tracking: 73998739; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PRICE, JOHN LEE (JR); Issued: 4/25/2022; Served: 4/28/2022; Returned: 4/29/2022; Tracking: 73998738; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: CITY OF HOUSTON;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HOUSTON COMMUNITY COLLEGE SYSTEM;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HOUSTON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Main Street Acquisition Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION is a litigant