This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/16/2018 at 21:28:18 (UTC).

HARRIS COUNTY vs. PATE, ELAINE RASH (AKA DOROTHY ELAINE RA

Case Summary

On 02/11/2016 HARRIS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against PATE, ELAINE RASH AKA DOROTHY ELAINE RA. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LARRY WEIMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8829

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LARRY WEIMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 01

Po Box 3064

Houston, TX 77253

HARRIS COUNTY

Po Box 3064

Houston, TX 77253

LONE STAR COLLEGE SYSTEM DISTRICT

Po Box 3064

Houston, TX 77253

HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 10

Po Box 3064

Houston, TX 77253

Intervenor Plaintiff

ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendants and Intervenor Defendants

ROPER, RALPH

New Caney, TX 77357

VOSHELL, JOHN ELWOOD

Humble, TX 77346

SELLARS, ANGELA L

Houston, TX 77084

FIFE, ANN (UNKNOWN ADDRESS)

STATE OF TEXAS (IN REM ONLY)

Austin, TX 78701

ROPER, JAMES CAROL SR

New Caney, TX 77357

PATE, ELAINE RASH (AKA DOROTHY ELAINE RASH)

Houston, TX 77032

BLAKEMORE, CHRISTINE

Coldsprings, TX 77331

RASH, DOROTHY ELAINE

Houston, TX 77032

RASH, DORTHY ELAINE (AKA ELAINE RASH PATE)

SELLARS, BRIAN M

Houston, TX 77082

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (CHILD SUPPORT DIVISION) (IN REM ONLY) BY

Austin, TX 78701

Others and Defendants

STATE OF TEXAS (IN REM ONLY) BY SERVING HONORABLE KEN PAXTON ATTORNEY

Austin, TX 78701

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (CHILD SUPPORT DIVISION) (IN REM ONLY) BY

Austin, TX 78701

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorney

RAMIREZ, ANNETTE

 

Court Documents

CITATION

02/11/2016: CITATION

CITATION

02/11/2016: CITATION

CITATION

02/11/2016: CITATION

CITATION

02/11/2016: CITATION

ORIGINAL PETITION

02/11/2016: ORIGINAL PETITION

Citation

03/08/2016: Citation

PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED PETITION

03/11/2016: PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED PETITION

Letter Requesting Issuance Of Service

03/31/2016: Letter Requesting Issuance Of Service

Exhibit A

04/12/2016: Exhibit A

Citation

05/09/2016: Citation

Citation by Publication

05/13/2016: Citation by Publication

Letter Requesting Issuance Of Service

06/02/2016: Letter Requesting Issuance Of Service

CITATION BY PUBLICATION

06/20/2016: CITATION BY PUBLICATION

Citation

06/23/2016: Citation

NOTICE OF NONSUIT

06/30/2016: NOTICE OF NONSUIT

NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

07/06/2016: NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

Proposed Order Of Dismissal

07/06/2016: Proposed Order Of Dismissal

MASTER IN CHANCERYS REPORT TO THE DISTRICT COURT

07/06/2016: MASTER IN CHANCERYS REPORT TO THE DISTRICT COURT

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2016
  • Description: NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162); Order Signed: 7/6/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Description: NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162); Order Signed: 6/30/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: RAMIREZ, ANNETTE; Person Filing: ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 01;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN; Person Filing: LONE STAR COLLEGE SYSTEM DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 10;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 01;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 10;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN; Person Filing: LONE STAR COLLEGE SYSTEM DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less