This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/06/2022 at 13:23:13 (UTC).

HARRIS COUNTY vs. MORMAN, CLEVELAND E

Case Summary

On 07/29/2022 HARRIS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against MORMAN, CLEVELAND E. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is BRITTANYE MORRIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5531

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

BRITTANYE MORRIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HARRIS COUNTY

CYPRESS-FAIRBANKS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 09

LONE STAR COLLEGE SYSTEM DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

Intervenor Plaintiff

HARRIS COUNTY MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT # 239

Defendants and Intervenor Defendants

MORMAN, CLEVELAND E

Katy, TX 77493

MORMAN, DAPHNE (AKA DAPHNE YVETTE ENGLISH MORMAN)

Katy, TX 77493

MORMAN, DAPHNE YVETTE ENGLISH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorney

MILLINGTON, DAMION J.

 

Court Documents

Original Petition

07/29/2022: Original Petition

Citation

07/29/2022: Citation

Citation

07/29/2022: Citation

INTERVENING PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

08/08/2022: INTERVENING PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

Citation

08/22/2022: Citation

Citation

08/16/2022: Citation

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: MILLINGTON, DAMION J.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT # 239;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MORMAN, DAPHNE (AKA DAPHNE YVETTE ENGLISH MORMAN); Issued: 8/1/2022; Served: 8/12/2022; Returned: 8/12/2022; Tracking: 74032987; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MORMAN, CLEVELAND E; Issued: 8/1/2022; Served: 8/18/2022; Returned: 8/18/2022; Tracking: 74032982; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 09;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: LONE STAR COLLEGE SYSTEM DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: CYPRESS-FAIRBANKS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cypress-Fairbanks Independent School District is a litigant

Latest cases where Harris County Municipal Utility District No. 213-A is a litigant

Latest cases where PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where Lone Star College System is a litigant