This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 03/18/2022 at 01:33:38 (UTC).

HARRIS COUNTY vs. MILTON, PAULA S

Case Summary

On 01/03/2022 HARRIS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against MILTON, PAULA S. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MIKE ENGELHART. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0004

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MIKE ENGELHART

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HARRIS COUNTY

KATY INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

CITY OF HOUSTON

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

Defendants and Others

MILTON, PAULA S

Danbury, TX 77534

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK (NATIONAL ASSOCIATION) (A FINANCIAL INSTITUTION)

1999 Bryan St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN

 

Court Documents

Original Petition

01/03/2022: Original Petition

Citation

01/03/2022: Citation

Citation

01/03/2022: Citation

Citation

02/01/2022: Citation

Citation

01/31/2022: Citation

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MILTON, PAULA S; Issued: 1/3/2022; Tracking: 73956634; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK (NATIONAL ASSOCIATION) (A FINANCIAL INSTITUTION); Issued: 1/3/2022; Served: 1/25/2022; Tracking: 73956633; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN; Person Filing: PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN; Person Filing: CITY OF HOUSTON;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN; Person Filing: KATY INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Katy Independant School District is a litigant

Latest cases where PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION is a litigant