Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 04/13/2021 at 11:11:22 (UTC).

HARRIS COUNTY vs. MIDDLETON, H M (DECEASED)

Case Summary

On 03/08/2016 HARRIS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against MIDDLETON, H M DECEASED. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are WESLEY R. WARD and LAUREN REEDER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4813

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

WESLEY R. WARD

LAUREN REEDER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HOUSTON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Po Box 3064

Houston, TX 77253

HARRIS COUNTY

Po Box 3064

Houston, TX 77253

CITY OF HOUSTON

Houston, TX 77253

HOUSTON COMMUNITY COLLEGE SYSTEM

Po Box 3064

Houston, TX 77253

Defendants

MIDDLETON, JUANITA M (DECEASED)

MIDDLETON, H M (DECEASED)

MIDDLETON, THOMAS (IN REM ONLY)

Houston, TX 77021

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III

Po Box 3064

Houston, TX 77253

Defendant Attorneys

CLEVENGER, GEORGE T.

15219 Stuebner A

Houston, TX 77069

CARTWRIGHT, PRINCE JR.

2208 Blodgett S

Houston, TX 77004

 

Court Documents

ORIGINAL PETITION

03/08/2016: ORIGINAL PETITION

CITATION BY PUBLICATION

08/30/2016: CITATION BY PUBLICATION

PROPOSED ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM

11/04/2016: PROPOSED ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM

MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM

11/04/2016: MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM

ORDER TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM GRANTED

12/30/2016: ORDER TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM GRANTED

Original Answer of Attorney Ad Litem for Juanita M. Middleton

01/11/2017: Original Answer of Attorney Ad Litem for Juanita M. Middleton

Original Answer of Attorney Ad Litem for H.M. Middleton

01/11/2017: Original Answer of Attorney Ad Litem for H.M. Middleton

NOTICE OF HEIR AND/OR INTERESTED PARTY FOUND

06/01/2017: NOTICE OF HEIR AND/OR INTERESTED PARTY FOUND

Citation

07/11/2017: Citation

DCA Generic Letter

12/14/2017: DCA Generic Letter

Notice of Trial/Default Hearing

12/19/2017: Notice of Trial/Default Hearing

Exhibit B

02/01/2018: Exhibit B

Exhibit A

02/01/2018: Exhibit A

Affidavit of Attorney Ad Litem For H.M. Middleton and Juanita Middleton

02/01/2018: Affidavit of Attorney Ad Litem For H.M. Middleton and Juanita Middleton

Notice of Trial/Default Hearing

02/08/2018: Notice of Trial/Default Hearing

Proposed Statement Of Evidence

05/04/2018: Proposed Statement Of Evidence

FEE AWARDED TO ATTORNEY AD LITEM

05/31/2018: FEE AWARDED TO ATTORNEY AD LITEM

Order of Sale in Tax Suits

09/18/2018: Order of Sale in Tax Suits

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketType of Service: ORDER OF SALE (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: EXECUTION ORDER OF SALE; Person: MIDDLETON, H M (DECEASED); Issued: 7/2/2018; Returned: 9/13/2018; Tracking: 73508677; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketDescription: ORDER GRANTING STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE SIGNED; Order Signed: 5/31/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketDescription: NO COSTS ALLOCATED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketDescription: FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY); Order Signed: 5/31/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketDescription: FEE AWARDED TO ATTORNEY AD LITEM; Order Signed: 5/31/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketDescription: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RECOMMENDED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketDescription: ATTORNEY FEES RECOMMENDED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketDescription: MASTER'S REPORT SIGNED; Order Signed: 5/11/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketDescription: HOLD FOR JUDGMENT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT RENDERED BY COURT AFTER TRIAL (NON-JURY);

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2017
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ATTORNEY AD LITEM; Filing Attorney: CLEVENGER, GEORGE T.; Person Filing: MIDDLETON, H M (DECEASED);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • DocketDescription: ORDER TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM GRANTED; Order Signed: 12/30/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • DocketDescription: APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM RECOMMENDED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • HearingCourt: 555; Docket Type: Tax Docket (Trial); Reason: AD LITEM APPOINTMENT ATTORNEY; Results: Granted; Comments: GEORGE CLEVNGER; Requesting Party: VONDER HAAR, VICTORIA DUNCAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • DocketType of Service: PUBLICATION (TAX); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MIDDLETON, JUANITA M (DECEASED); Issued: 8/9/2016; Served: 8/15/2016; Returned: 8/26/2016; Tracking: 73262989; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • DocketType of Service: PUBLICATION (TAX); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MIDDLETON, H M (DECEASED); Issued: 8/9/2016; Served: 8/15/2016; Returned: 8/26/2016; Tracking: 73262986; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III; Person Filing: CITY OF HOUSTON;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III; Person Filing: HOUSTON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III; Person Filing: HOUSTON COMMUNITY COLLEGE SYSTEM;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOUSTON COMMUNITY COLLEGE SYSTEM is a litigant

Latest cases where Houston Independent School District is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLEVENGER, GEORGE T.