This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/13/2022 at 07:49:16 (UTC).

HARRIS COUNTY vs. MENDEZ, ERNEST

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 HARRIS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against MENDEZ, ERNEST. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is BRITTANYE MORRIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0261

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

BRITTANYE MORRIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HARRIS COUNTY

CITY OF SOUTH HOUSTON

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

Defendants and Others

MENDEZ, ERNEST

Houston, TX 77089

MENDEZ, JENNIFER LOUISE

Houston, TX 77089

PROPEL FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC

PROPEL FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC (A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) (IN

211 E 7Th St Ste 620

Austin, TX 78701

Others

CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY DBA CSC LAWYERS INCORPORATING SERVICE COMP

PROPEL FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC (A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) (IN

211 E 7Th St Ste 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALFRED, MARGARET E.

 

Court Documents

Original Petition

05/20/2022: Original Petition

Citation

05/20/2022: Citation

Citation

05/20/2022: Citation

Citation

05/20/2022: Citation

Citation/Return of Service

06/01/2022: Citation/Return of Service

Citation/Return of Service

06/01/2022: Citation/Return of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PROPEL FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC (A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) (IN; Issued: 5/25/2022; Tracking: 74009956; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MENDEZ, JENNIFER LOUISE; Issued: 5/25/2022; Served: 5/27/2022; Returned: 5/27/2022; Tracking: 74009955; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MENDEZ, ERNEST; Issued: 5/25/2022; Served: 5/27/2022; Returned: 5/27/2022; Tracking: 74009954; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ALFRED, MARGARET E.; Person Filing: PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ALFRED, MARGARET E.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ALFRED, MARGARET E.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ALFRED, MARGARET E.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ALFRED, MARGARET E.; Person Filing: CITY OF SOUTH HOUSTON;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ALFRED, MARGARET E.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Propel Financial Services LLC, as Agent and Attorney in Fact for TLF National Tax Li is a litigant

Latest cases where PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION is a litigant