Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 03/29/2021 at 07:22:40 (UTC).

HARRIS COUNTY vs. MAYES, JOYELLE GREEN

Case Summary

On 03/05/2021 HARRIS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against MAYES, JOYELLE GREEN. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is C. ELLIOTT THORNTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2685

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

C. ELLIOTT THORNTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 09

HARRIS COUNTY

LONE STAR COLLEGE SYSTEM DISTRICT

CYPRESS-FAIRBANKS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

Others and Defendants

FGMS HOLDINGS LLC (A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) (IN REM

1114 Lost Creek Blvd Ste 100

Austin, TX 78746

RICEWOOD VILLAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC (A TEXAS NON-PROFIT

11000 Corporate Centre Dr Ste 150

Houston, TX 77041

MAYES, ERIC

Katy, TX 77449

JPMJ FINANCIAL LLC (DBA CAPITAL VIDA) (A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY

18402 Rogers Pike San

Antonio, TX 78258

CAPITAL VIDA (IN REM ONLY)

MAYES, JOYELLE GREEN

Katy, TX 77449

PRINCE, WAYMAN L (IN REM ONLY)

Houston, TX 77024

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARMAR, PANKA J. R.

 

Court Documents

Citation

03/15/2021: Citation

Citation

03/16/2021: Citation

INTERVENING PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

03/23/2021: INTERVENING PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

citation

03/05/2021: citation

citation

03/05/2021: citation

citation

03/05/2021: citation

citation

03/05/2021: citation

citation

03/05/2021: citation

citation

03/05/2021: citation

Original Petition

03/05/2021: Original Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: JPMJ FINANCIAL LLC (DBA CAPITAL VIDA) (A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY; Issued: 3/5/2021; Tracking: 73846975; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: FGMS HOLDINGS LLC (A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) (IN REM; Issued: 3/5/2021; Tracking: 73846972; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PRINCE, WAYMAN L (IN REM ONLY); Issued: 3/5/2021; Served: 3/11/2021; Returned: 3/12/2021; Received: 3/15/2021; Tracking: 73846971; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: RICEWOOD VILLAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC (A TEXAS NON-PROFIT; Issued: 3/5/2021; Returned: 3/22/2021; Received: 3/23/2021; Tracking: 73846970; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MAYES, ERIC; Issued: 3/5/2021; Tracking: 73846967; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MAYES, JOYELLE GREEN; Issued: 3/5/2021; Returned: 3/15/2021; Tracking: 73846966; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: CYPRESS-FAIRBANKS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: LONE STAR COLLEGE SYSTEM DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 09;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RICEWOOD VILLAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where FGMS HOLDINGS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Cypress-Fairbanks Independent School District is a litigant

Latest cases where PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY is a litigant