Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/12/2020 at 10:09:35 (UTC).

HARRIS COUNTY vs. JARAMILLO, RAMIRO AMADOR

Case Summary

On 03/23/2020 HARRIS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against JARAMILLO, RAMIRO AMADOR. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOT DOLLINGER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8772

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

SCOT DOLLINGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

HOUSTON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

HOUSTON COMMUNITY COLLEGE SYSTEM

HARRIS COUNTY

CITY OF HOUSTON

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

Defendants

FGMS HOLDINGS LLC (A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) (IN REM ONLY)

SOMBRERO CAPITAL LLC (A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) (IN REM ONLY)

4514 San Pedro Ave San

Antonio, TX 78212

JARAMILLO, RAMIRO AMADOR

Houston, TX 77076

RODRIGUEZ, ARACELI

Houston, TX 77076

Others and Defendants

SOMBRERO CAPITAL LLC (A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) (IN REM ONLY)

4514 San Pedro Ave San

Antonio, TX 78212

FGMS HOLDING LLC (A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) (IN REM ONLY)

1114 Lost Creek Lvd Ste 100

Austin, TX 78746

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARMAR, PANKA J. R.

Defendant Attorney

REYES, FRUMENCIO JR.

 

Court Documents

Citation

05/07/2020: Citation

Citation

05/07/2020: Citation

Defendant's Original Answer

05/08/2020: Defendant's Original Answer

Citation

06/01/2020: Citation

Citation

03/23/2020: Citation

Citation

03/23/2020: Citation

Citation

03/23/2020: Citation

Citation

03/23/2020: Citation

Original Petition

03/23/2020: Original Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: REYES, FRUMENCIO JR.; Person Filing: RODRIGUEZ, ARACELI;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: JARAMILLO, RAMIRO AMADOR; Issued: 3/24/2020; Served: 5/5/2020; Returned: 5/6/2020; Received: 5/7/2020; Tracking: 73737628; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SOMBRERO CAPITAL LLC (A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) (IN REM ONLY); Issued: 3/24/2020; Tracking: 73737627; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: FGMS HOLDING LLC (A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) (IN REM ONLY); Issued: 3/24/2020; Served: 5/21/2020; Received: 6/1/2020; Tracking: 73737625; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: RODRIGUEZ, ARACELI; Issued: 3/24/2020; Served: 5/5/2020; Returned: 5/6/2020; Received: 5/7/2020; Tracking: 73737620; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HOUSTON COMMUNITY COLLEGE SYSTEM;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HOUSTON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: CITY OF HOUSTON;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FGMS HOLDINGS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where Harris County Hospital District is a litigant