This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/24/2018 at 02:34:08 (UTC).

HARRIS COUNTY vs. IMPERIAL OIL COMPANY (F/K/A RUDY BUILDING COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/08/2016 HARRIS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against IMPERIAL OIL COMPANY F/K/A RUDY BUILDING COMPANY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL GOMEZ. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4820

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL GOMEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CITY OF HOUSTON LIENS

Houston, TX 77253

HARRIS COUNTY

Po Box 3064

Houston, TX 77253

CITY OF HOUSTON

Houston, TX 77253

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

Intervenor Plaintiffs

GALENA PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

SAN JACINTO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

Defendants and Intervenor Defendants

IMPERIAL OIL COMPANY (F/K/A RUDY BUILDING COMPANY INC A/K/A RUDY

22499 Imperial Valley Dr.

Houston, TX 77073

SPARKS, MOZELL

Willis, TX 77318

MINCHEN, JORDAN T

Houston, TX 77056

MINCHEN, MEYER A

Houston, TX 77098

MINCHEN, JOAN R

Houston, TX 77057

Others

IMPERIAL OIL COMPANY FKA RUDY BUILDING COMPNAY INC

RUDY, ELLIS

Houston, TX 77073

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorneys

WIEHLE, ELIZABETH ANN

SNOOKS, DANIEL JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

CITATION

03/08/2016: CITATION

Original Petition for Taxes and Claim for City of Houston Special Assessments

03/08/2016: Original Petition for Taxes and Claim for City of Houston Special Assessments

Citation

03/28/2016: Citation

Citation

04/27/2016: Citation

Letter requesting issuance of service

05/03/2016: Letter requesting issuance of service

Defendants Original Answer

05/16/2016: Defendants Original Answer

NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

05/31/2016: NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR TAXES AND CLAIM FOR CITY OF HOUSTON SPECIAL ASSESSMENTS

05/31/2016: PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR TAXES AND CLAIM FOR CITY OF HOUSTON SPECIAL ASSESSMENTS

Answer

06/03/2016: Answer

Citation

06/23/2016: Citation

INTERVENING PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED PETITION

07/06/2016: INTERVENING PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED PETITION

DCA Generic Letter

07/21/2016: DCA Generic Letter

Notice of Trial

07/22/2016: Notice of Trial

Notice Of Trial Hearing

10/04/2016: Notice Of Trial Hearing

NOTICE OF TRIAL HEARING

10/04/2016: NOTICE OF TRIAL HEARING

FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY)

01/07/2017: FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY)

Request for order of sale for tax suit

02/16/2017: Request for order of sale for tax suit

Order of Sale In Tax Suits

06/29/2017: Order of Sale In Tax Suits

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2017
  • Description: DEFENDANT COSTS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2017
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED AWARDING ATTORNEY FEES; Order Signed: 1/7/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2017
  • Description: INTERLOCUTORY DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Order Signed: 1/7/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2017
  • Description: ORDER SGND GRANTING SALE OF PROPERTY; Order Signed: 1/7/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2017
  • Description: FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY); Order Signed: 1/7/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2016
  • Description: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RECOMMENDED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2016
  • Description: HOLD FOR JUDGMENT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2016
  • Description: JUDGMENT RENDERED BY COURT AFTER TRIAL (NON-JURY);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • Description: AWAITING TAX MASTER RECOMMENDATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Description: TO TRIAL ON MERITS (NON JURY);

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: SPARKS, MOZELL;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: WIEHLE, ELIZABETH ANN; Person Filing: GALENA PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: SNOOKS, DANIEL JOSEPH; Person Filing: SAN JACINTO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III; Person Filing: CITY OF HOUSTON LIENS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III; Person Filing: CITY OF HOUSTON;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III; Person Filing: PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less