This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/26/2022 at 09:50:47 (UTC).

HARRIS COUNTY vs. HURTADO, JOSE D (AKA JOSE DOLORES HURTADO)

Case Summary

On 07/29/2022 HARRIS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HURTADO, JOSE D AKA JOSE DOLORES HURTADO. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MIKE ENGELHART. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5529

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MIKE ENGELHART

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HARRIS COUNTY

CITY OF HOUSTON

LONE STAR COLLEGE SYSTEM DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

Intervenor Plaintiff

ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendants, Intervenor Defendants and Others

HURTADO, JOSE D (AKA JOSE DOLORES HURTADO)

Houston, TX 77064

HURTADO, JOSE DOLORES

COBURN SUPPLY COMPANY INC (A TEXAS CORPORATION) (IN REM ONLY)

206 E 9Th Street Suite 1300

Austin, TX 78701

MUSTANG RENTAL SERVICES OF TEXAS LLC (FKA MUSTANG RENTAL SERVICES OF

12800 Northwest Fwy

Houston, TX 77040

FLEMING, SELINA FAYE (IN REM ONLY)

Houston, TX 77088

MUSTANG RENTAL SERVICES OF TEXAS LTD (IN REM ONLY)

Defendants, Others and Intervenor Defendants

COBURN SUPPLY COMPANY INC (A TEXAS CORPORATION) (IN REM ONLY)

206 E 9Th Street Suite 1300

Austin, TX 78701

MUSTANG RENTAL SERVICES OF TEXAS LLC (FKA MUSTANG RENTAL SERVICES OF

12800 Northwest Fwy

Houston, TX 77040

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorney

RAMIREZ, ANNETTE

Defendant Attorney

YOUNG, JERRY MCFADDIN

 

Court Documents

Original Petition

07/29/2022: Original Petition

Citation

07/29/2022: Citation

Citation

07/29/2022: Citation

Citation

07/29/2022: Citation

Citation

07/29/2022: Citation

CITATION -- Selina Faye Fleming (In Rem Only)

08/15/2022: CITATION -- Selina Faye Fleming (In Rem Only)

Intervenor's Original Petition

08/10/2022: Intervenor's Original Petition

Exhibit A

08/10/2022: Exhibit A

Citation (Tax Suit)

09/02/2022: Citation (Tax Suit)

Citation

08/25/2022: Citation

Citation

08/15/2022: Citation

Citation

08/11/2022: Citation

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: YOUNG, JERRY MCFADDIN; Person Filing: MUSTANG RENTAL SERVICES OF TEXAS LLC (FKA MUSTANG RENTAL SERVICES OF;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: FLEMING, SELINA FAYE (IN REM ONLY); Issued: 8/16/2022; Served: 8/23/2022; Returned: 8/24/2022; Tracking: 74039055; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: RAMIREZ, ANNETTE; Person Filing: ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: FLEMING, SELINA FAYE (IN REM ONLY); Issued: 7/29/2022; Received: 8/15/2022; Tracking: 74032368; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MUSTANG RENTAL SERVICES OF TEXAS LLC (FKA MUSTANG RENTAL SERVICES OF; Issued: 7/29/2022; Served: 8/10/2022; Returned: 8/10/2022; Tracking: 74032367; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: COBURN SUPPLY COMPANY INC (A TEXAS CORPORATION) (IN REM ONLY); Issued: 7/29/2022; Served: 8/24/2022; Tracking: 74032366; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HURTADO, JOSE D (AKA JOSE DOLORES HURTADO); Issued: 7/29/2022; Tracking: 74032365; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: LONE STAR COLLEGE SYSTEM DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: CITY OF HOUSTON;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MUSTANG RENTAL SERVICES OF TEXAS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Coburn Supply Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY is a litigant