Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 11/27/2020 at 23:24:52 (UTC).

HARRIS COUNTY vs. HAVRAN, ALICE Z (A/K/A HAVRAN, ALICE ZBORIL A/K/A

Case Summary

On 07/23/2015 HARRIS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HAVRAN, ALICE Z A/K/A HAVRAN, ALICE ZBORIL A/K/A. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is RABEEA COLLIER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2432

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

RABEEA COLLIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HARRIS COUNTY

CITY OF HOUSTON

HOUSTON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

HOUSTON COMMUNITY COLLEGE SYSTEM

Defendants

HAVRAN, ELO J. ( AKA ELO JOSEPH HAVRAN SR )

ELO JOSEPH HAVRAN SR

HAVRAN, ALICE Z. ( AKA ALICE ZBORIL HAVRAN AKA ALICE JEAN HAVRAN )

ALICE ZBORIL HAVRAN

ALICE JEAN HAVRAN

HAVRAN, ELO J (A/K/A ELO JOSEPH HAVRAN SR)

HAVRAN, ALICE Z (A/K/A HAVRAN, ALICE ZBORIL A/K/A HAVRAN, ALICE JEAN)

HAVRAN, ALICE ZBORIL

HAVRAN, ELO JOSEPH SR

HAVRAN, ALICE JEAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WATKINS, EMILY KING

Defendant Attorney

CLEVENGER, GEORGE T.

 

Court Documents

Letter Requesting Issuance Of Service

01/15/2016: Letter Requesting Issuance Of Service

Citation by Publication

02/19/2016: Citation by Publication

Proposed Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem

04/20/2016: Proposed Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem

proposed Master In Chncery's Report To The District Court

04/20/2016: proposed Master In Chncery's Report To The District Court

Notice Of Hearing To Appoint Attorney Ad Litem

04/20/2016: Notice Of Hearing To Appoint Attorney Ad Litem

ORDER TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM GRANTED

06/03/2016: ORDER TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM GRANTED

Original Answer for Attorney Ad Litem

09/16/2016: Original Answer for Attorney Ad Litem

Motion for Continuance

09/26/2016: Motion for Continuance

NOTICE OF TRIAL

09/29/2016: NOTICE OF TRIAL

Exhibit C

11/29/2016: Exhibit C

Master in Chancery's Report to the district court

11/30/2016: Master in Chancery's Report to the district court

FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY)

12/22/2016: FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY)

ORDER GRANTING STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE SIGNED

12/22/2016: ORDER GRANTING STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE SIGNED

FEE AWARDED TO ATTORNEY AD LITEM

12/22/2016: FEE AWARDED TO ATTORNEY AD LITEM

Request for Tax Order of Sale

03/01/2017: Request for Tax Order of Sale

Order of sale in tax suits

05/11/2017: Order of sale in tax suits

Invoice

05/16/2017: Invoice

Certified Mail Receipt

06/29/2017: Certified Mail Receipt

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2017
  • DocketType of Service: ORDER OF SALE (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: EXECUTION ORDER OF SALE; Person: HAVRAN, ELO J (A/K/A ELO JOSEPH HAVRAN SR); Issued: 3/16/2017; Served: 5/2/2017; Tracking: 73346847; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • HearingCourt: 555; Docket Type: Tax Docket (Trial); Reason: Trial on Merits; Results: Re-Set; Requesting Party: STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • DocketDescription: ORDER GRANTING STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE SIGNED; Order Signed: 12/22/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • DocketDescription: DEFENDANT COSTS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • DocketDescription: FEE AWARDED TO ATTORNEY AD LITEM; Order Signed: 12/22/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • DocketDescription: FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY); Order Signed: 12/22/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2016
  • DocketDescription: ATTORNEY FEES RECOMMENDED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2016
  • DocketDescription: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RECOMMENDED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2016
  • DocketDescription: STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE GRANTED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2016
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT RENDERED BY COURT AFTER TRIAL (NON-JURY);

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2016
  • DocketDescription: APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM RECOMMENDED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • DocketDescription: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • HearingCourt: 555; Docket Type: Tax Docket (Trial); Reason: AD LITEM APPOINTMENT ATTORNEY; Results: Heard (No Ruling Made); Requesting Party: STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • DocketDescription: MOTION TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM HEARD NO RULING MADE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • DocketType of Service: PUBLICATION (TAX); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HAVRAN, ALICE Z (A/K/A HAVRAN, ALICE ZBORIL A/K/A HAVRAN, ALICE JEAN); Issued: 2/2/2016; Served: 2/10/2016; Returned: 2/17/2016; Tracking: 73212047; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • DocketType of Service: PUBLICATION (TAX); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HAVRAN, ELO J (A/K/A ELO JOSEPH HAVRAN SR); Issued: 2/2/2016; Served: 2/10/2016; Returned: 2/17/2016; Tracking: 73212046; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WATKINS, EMILY KING; Person Filing: CITY OF HOUSTON;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WATKINS, EMILY KING; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WATKINS, EMILY KING; Person Filing: HOUSTON COMMUNITY COLLEGE SYSTEM;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WATKINS, EMILY KING; Person Filing: HOUSTON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOUSTON COMMUNITY COLLEGE SYSTEM is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLEVENGER, GEORGE T.