This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/20/2018 at 13:11:49 (UTC).

HARRIS COUNTY vs. GIBBARD, JULIA LYNN (DECEASED)

Case Summary

On 01/07/2016 HARRIS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against GIBBARD, JULIA LYNN DECEASED. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KYLE CARTER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0879

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KYLE CARTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 08

Po Box 3064

Houston, TX 77253

HARRIS COUNTY

Po Box 3064

Houston, TX 77253

LONE STAR COLLEGE SYSTEM DISTRICT

Po Box 3064

Houston, TX 77253

Others and Defendants

BANK OF AMERICA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FKA REPUBLIC NATIONAL BANK OF

1999 C T Corporation System

Dallas, TX 75201

GIBBARD, JULIA LYNN (DECEASED)

GIBBARD, GRAHAM ( AKA GRAHAM STEWART GIBBARD )

Denver, CO 80210

CATE, MADGE WALDEN AKA MADGELYN WALDEN CATE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS

THE ESTATE OF H C CASTE (AKA MADGELYN WALDEN CATE) (DECEASED)

GIBBARD, JOHN

Patterson, NY 12563

CATE, H C (UNKNOWN ADDRESS)

BANK OF AMERICA NA

CATE, MADGELYN WALDEN

GIBBARD, GRAHAM STEWART

Denver, CO 80210

CATTE, MADGE WALDEN (AKA MADGELYN WALDEN CATE INDEPENDENTLY AND AS

CATE, MADGELYN WALDEN (INDEPENDTLY AND AS INDEPENDENT ADMINSTRATRIX OF

GIBBARD, GRAHAM (AKA GRAHAM STEWART GIBBARD) BY SERVING THE TEXAS

Denver, CO 80210

GIBBARD, JOHN BY SERVING THE TEXAS SECRETARY OF STATE AT 1019 BRAZOS

2891 Route 22

Patterson, NY 12563

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARMAR, PANKA J. R.

Defendant Attorneys

WILLIAMS, JONATHAN M.

MONTGOMERY, LANE ALEX

 

Court Documents

CITATION

01/07/2016: CITATION

ORIGINAL PETITION

01/07/2016: ORIGINAL PETITION

The State of Texas Secretary of State

02/01/2016: The State of Texas Secretary of State

Notice of Partial Dismissal

03/10/2016: Notice of Partial Dismissal

Plaintiffs First Amended Petition

03/10/2016: Plaintiffs First Amended Petition

Secretary of State

04/07/2016: Secretary of State

Secretary of State

04/07/2016: Secretary of State

Letter Requesting Issuance Of Service

08/24/2016: Letter Requesting Issuance Of Service

Citation By Publication executed

09/13/2016: Citation By Publication executed

ORDER TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM GRANTED

12/30/2016: ORDER TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM GRANTED

Defendants Original Answer

02/03/2017: Defendants Original Answer

Notice of Trial

02/06/2017: Notice of Trial

Notice of Trial

02/09/2017: Notice of Trial

Notice of Trial

04/25/2017: Notice of Trial

DCA Generic Letter

04/27/2017: DCA Generic Letter

Affidavit of Attorney Ad Litem for Defendant Julia Lynn Gibbard and Madge Walden Cate

05/31/2017: Affidavit of Attorney Ad Litem for Defendant Julia Lynn Gibbard and Madge Walden Cate

FEE AWARDED TO ATTORNEY AD LITEM

06/02/2017: FEE AWARDED TO ATTORNEY AD LITEM

Order of Sale In Tax Suits

03/12/2018: Order of Sale In Tax Suits

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2017
  • Description: FEE AWARDED TO ATTORNEY AD LITEM; Order Signed: 6/2/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Description: FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY); Order Signed: 6/2/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Description: JUDGMENT RENDERED BY COURT AFTER TRIAL (NON-JURY);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Description: ORDER GRANTING STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE SIGNED; Order Signed: 6/2/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Description: ORDER SGND GRANTING SALE OF PROPERTY; Order Signed: 6/2/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Description: DEFENDANT COSTS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Description: TO TRIAL ON MERITS (NON JURY);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Description: STENO RECORD MADE (TAX);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Description: EVIDENCE PRESENTED-NON JURY (EACH DAY);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • Description: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2016
  • Description: ORDER TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM GRANTED; Order Signed: 12/30/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2016
  • Description: PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION; Order Signed: 3/20/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 08;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: LONE STAR COLLEGE SYSTEM DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WILLIAMS, JONATHAN M.; Person Filing: BANK OF AMERICA NA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WILLIAMS, JONATHAN M.; Person Filing: BANK OF AMERICA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FKA REPUBLIC NATIONAL BANK OF;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: LONE STAR COLLEGE SYSTEM DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICT # 08;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less