This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/26/2022 at 09:51:50 (UTC).

HARRIS COUNTY vs. GARCIA, PERLITA (AKA PERLITA GARCIA ESTUPINAN) (IN REM ONLY)

Case Summary

On 07/29/2022 HARRIS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against GARCIA, PERLITA AKA PERLITA GARCIA ESTUPINAN IN REM ONLY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is RABEEA COLLIER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5536

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

RABEEA COLLIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HARRIS COUNTY

CITY OF HOUSTON

LONE STAR COLLEGE SYSTEM DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

Intervenor Plaintiff

ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT OF HARRIS COUNTY

Defendants

GARCIA, PERLITA (AKA PERLITA GARCIA ESTUPINAN) (IN REM ONLY)

Pasadena, TX 77506

ESTUPINAN, PERLITA GARCIA (IN REM ONLY)

CEDANO, JOSEPHINA (IN REM ONLY)

Baytown, TX 77520

GARCIA, BRISEIDA (AKA BRISEIDA MENDOZA) (IN REM ONLY)

Baytown, TX 77520

MENDOZA, BRISEIDA (IN REM ONLY)

GARCIA, IGNACIO (IN REM ONLY)

Houston, TX 77060

Intervenor Defendants

GARCIA, PERLITA (AKA PERLITA GARCIA ESTUPINAN)

ESTUPINAN, PERLITA GARCIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorney

RAMIREZ, ANNETTE

 

Court Documents

Original Petition

07/29/2022: Original Petition

Citation

07/29/2022: Citation

Citation

07/29/2022: Citation

Citation

07/29/2022: Citation

Citation

07/29/2022: Citation

INTERVENORS ORIGINAL PETITION

08/10/2022: INTERVENORS ORIGINAL PETITION

EXHIBIT A

08/10/2022: EXHIBIT A

Citation

08/04/2022: Citation

Citation

08/22/2022: Citation

Citation

08/16/2022: Citation

Citation

09/02/2022: Citation

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: RAMIREZ, ANNETTE; Person Filing: ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT OF HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GARCIA, IGNACIO (IN REM ONLY); Issued: 7/29/2022; Returned: 8/30/2022; Tracking: 74032400; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GARCIA, BRISEIDA (AKA BRISEIDA MENDOZA) (IN REM ONLY); Issued: 7/29/2022; Served: 8/17/2022; Returned: 8/17/2022; Tracking: 74032399; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CEDANO, JOSEPHINA (IN REM ONLY); Issued: 7/29/2022; Returned: 8/11/2022; Tracking: 74032396; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GARCIA, PERLITA (AKA PERLITA GARCIA ESTUPINAN) (IN REM ONLY); Issued: 7/29/2022; Returned: 8/2/2022; Tracking: 74032395; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: LONE STAR COLLEGE SYSTEM DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: CITY OF HOUSTON;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where Lone Star College System is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION is a litigant