Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 04/12/2021 at 07:18:18 (UTC).

HARRIS COUNTY vs. GALLEGOS, EVERTANO

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 HARRIS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against GALLEGOS, EVERTANO. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JERALYNN MANOR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5998

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JERALYNN MANOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CITY OF PASADENA

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

Defendants

STATE OF TEXAS CHILD SUPPORT DIVISION (IN REM ONLY)

GALLEGOS, EVERTANO

Pasadena, TX 77502

Other

STATE OF TEXAS CHILD SUPPORT DIVISION (IN REM ONLY) BY SERVING

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARMAR, PANKA J. R.

 

Court Documents

Citation

03/29/2021: Citation

CITATION

03/19/2021: CITATION

CITATION

03/19/2021: CITATION

ORIGINAL PETITION

03/19/2021: ORIGINAL PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: STATE OF TEXAS CHILD SUPPORT DIVISION (IN REM ONLY) BY SERVING; Issued: 3/19/2021; Tracking: 73852032; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GALLEGOS, EVERTANO; Issued: 3/19/2021; Served: 3/24/2021; Returned: 3/25/2021; Tracking: 73852029; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: CITY OF PASADENA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKA J. R.; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION is a litigant