This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 01/23/2023 at 07:49:11 (UTC).

HARRIS COUNTY vs. GAINOUS, CLIFTON (IN REM ONLY)

Case Summary

On 12/30/2022 HARRIS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against GAINOUS, CLIFTON IN REM ONLY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERICKA PHILLIPS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4088

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERICKA PHILLIPS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HARRIS COUNTY

CITY OF HOUSTON LIENS

CITY OF HOUSTON

LONE STAR COLLEGE SYSTEM DISTRICT

Defendants

GAINOUS, CLIFTON

GAINOUS, MARTEL ( AKA MARTEL WAYNE GAINOUS )

MARTEL WAYNE GAINOUS

GAINOUS, ANDREW

WYATT, ELLA DORIS GAINOUS ( AKA ELLEN DORIS WYATT )

ELLEN DORIS WYATT

GAINOUS, JIM

GAINOUS, SHEMIKA Y. ( AKA SHEMICA GAINOUS PERRINO )

SHEMICA GAINOUS PERRINO

GAINOUS, CLAYTON J. ( AKA CLAYTON JERMAINE GAINOUS )

CLAYTON JERMAINE GAINOUS

GAINOUS, JACOBY ( AKA JECOBY DELEON GAINOUS )

JECOBY DELEON GAINOUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN

 

Court Documents

Citation

12/30/2022: Citation

Citation

12/30/2022: Citation

Citation

12/30/2022: Citation

Citation

12/30/2022: Citation

Citation

12/30/2022: Citation

Citation

12/30/2022: Citation

Citation

12/30/2022: Citation

Citation

12/30/2022: Citation

Citation

12/30/2022: Citation

Citation

12/30/2022: Citation

Citation

12/30/2022: Citation

Original Petition for Texas and Claim for City of Houston Special Assessments

12/30/2022: Original Petition for Texas and Claim for City of Houston Special Assessments

Citation

01/09/2023: Citation

Citation

01/11/2023: Citation

Citation

01/13/2023: Citation

Citation

01/17/2023: Citation

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CLAYTON JERMAINE GAINOUS; Issued: 1/4/2023; Served: 1/6/2023; Returned: 1/6/2023; Tracking: 74095383; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GAINOUS, CLAYTON J. ( AKA CLAYTON JERMAINE GAINOUS ); Issued: 1/4/2023; Returned: 1/12/2023; Tracking: 74095382; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GAINOUS, SHEMIKA Y. ( AKA SHEMICA GAINOUS PERRINO ); Issued: 1/4/2023; Tracking: 74095381; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GAINOUS, JIM; Issued: 1/4/2023; Tracking: 74095378; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GAINOUS, ANDREW; Issued: 1/4/2023; Tracking: 74095376; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LONE STAR COLLEGE SYSTEM DISTRICT; Issued: 1/4/2023; Tracking: 74095375; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: JECOBY DELEON GAINOUS; Issued: 1/4/2023; Served: 1/10/2023; Returned: 1/10/2023; Tracking: 74095359; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SHEMICA GAINOUS PERRINO; Issued: 1/4/2023; Tracking: 74095356; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GAINOUS, JACOBY ( AKA JECOBY DELEON GAINOUS ); Issued: 1/4/2023; Tracking: 74095342; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: WYATT, ELLA DORIS GAINOUS ( AKA ELLEN DORIS WYATT ); Issued: 1/4/2023; Tracking: 74095328; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GAINOUS, CLIFTON; Issued: 1/4/2023; Returned: 1/11/2023; Tracking: 74095327; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN; Person Filing: GAINOUS, MARTEL ( AKA MARTEL WAYNE GAINOUS );

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN; Person Filing: MARTEL WAYNE GAINOUS;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN; Person Filing: GAINOUS, ANDREW;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN; Person Filing: LONE STAR COLLEGE SYSTEM DISTRICT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN; Person Filing: CITY OF HOUSTON LIENS;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN; Person Filing: CITY OF HOUSTON;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less