Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 12/28/2016 at 22:17:24 (UTC).

HARRIS COUNTY vs. EVANS, MARCAS PAGE ( AKA MARCAS JEAN EVANS PAGE )

Case Summary

On 03/29/2016 HARRIS COUNTY filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against EVANS, MARCAS PAGE AKA MARCAS JEAN EVANS PAGE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL D. MILLER. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0010

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL D. MILLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

HOUSTON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Po Box 3064

Houston, TX 77253

HOUSTON COMMUNITY COLLEGE SYSTEM

Po Box 3064

Houston, TX 77253

HARRIS COUNTY

Po Box 3064

Houston, TX 77253

CITY OF HOUSTON

Houston, TX 77253

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

Defendants

EVANS, MARCAS PAGE ( AKA MARCAS JEAN EVANS PAGE )

Houston, TX 77026

SCOTT, KEITH E

Richmond, TX 77469

SCOTT, ROBIN LEE

Houston, TX 77026

PAGE, MARCAS JEAN EVANS

Houston, TX 77026

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III

HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA

Defendant Attorney

CLEVENGER, GEORGE T.

 

Court Documents

CITATION

03/29/2016: CITATION

Citation

04/12/2016: Citation

Citation

04/12/2016: Citation

Citation

04/22/2016: Citation

CITATION BY PUBLICATION

05/12/2016: CITATION BY PUBLICATION

PROPOSED MASTER IN CHANCERY'S REPORT TO THE DISTRICT COURT

05/26/2016: PROPOSED MASTER IN CHANCERY'S REPORT TO THE DISTRICT COURT

PROPOSED ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM

05/26/2016: PROPOSED ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM

NOTICE OF HEARING TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM

05/26/2016: NOTICE OF HEARING TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

05/26/2016: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Original Answer of Attorney Ad Litem

09/14/2016: Original Answer of Attorney Ad Litem

NOTICE OF TRIAL/ DEFAULT HEARING

10/10/2016: NOTICE OF TRIAL/ DEFAULT HEARING

Mail Manifest

10/27/2016: Mail Manifest

NOTICE OF HEIR AND/OR INTERESTED PARTY FOUND

11/01/2016: NOTICE OF HEIR AND/OR INTERESTED PARTY FOUND

Plaintiff's First Amended Petition

11/01/2016: Plaintiff's First Amended Petition

Exhibit B

11/03/2016: Exhibit B

Notice of Trial/Default Hearing

11/07/2016: Notice of Trial/Default Hearing

Plaintiffs Second Amended Petition

11/07/2016: Plaintiffs Second Amended Petition

Notice of Trial/Default Hearing

11/29/2016: Notice of Trial/Default Hearing

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKAJ R; Person Filing: CITY OF HOUSTON;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKAJ R; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKAJ R; Person Filing: HOUSTON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PARMAR, PANKAJ R; Person Filing: HOUSTON COMMUNITY COLLEGE SYSTEM;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2016
  • Description: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ATTORNEY AD LITEM; Filing Attorney: CLEVENGER, GEORGE T.; Person Filing: EVANS, MARCAS PAGE ( AKA MARCAS JEAN EVANS PAGE );

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ATTORNEY AD LITEM; Filing Attorney: CLEVENGER, GEORGE T.; Person Filing: PAGE, MARCAS JEAN EVANS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • Description: ORDER TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM GRANTED; Order Signed: 7/13/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • Description: APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM RECOMMENDED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HOUSTON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: CITY OF HOUSTON;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HOUSTON COMMUNITY COLLEGE SYSTEM;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III; Person Filing: PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HERNANDEZ, ANGELICA MARIA; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where Harris County Hospital District is a litigant